EP2539110 - FASTENER BACK-OUT EROSION DEVICES AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perfect Point Edm Corporation 15000 Bolsa Chica Street Unit C Huntington Beach, CA 92649 / US | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEGGE, James Rancho Palos Verdes CA / US | 02 /
GOLD, Kenneth Bell Canyon CA / US | 03 /
RUDGLEY, Mervyn Mission Viejo CA / US | 04 /
GIBBONS, Michael Costa Mesa CA / US | 05 /
GERLACH, Richard Rolling Hills Estates CA / US | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Crease, Devanand John, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Crease, Devanand John, et al Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 11747806.5 | 18.02.2011 | WO2011US00301 | Priority number, date | US20100308799P | 26.02.2010 Original published format: US 308799 P | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011106080 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2539110 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B25B27/00, B25B33/00, B21J15/50, B23H9/00, B23H11/00 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
B25B27/18 (EP);
B21J15/50 (EP);
B23H1/00 (EP);
B23H1/10 (EP);
B23H11/00 (EP);
B23H9/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEME ZUR AUSFRÄSUNGSEROSION EINER HALTERUNG | [2013/01] | English: | FASTENER BACK-OUT EROSION DEVICES AND SYSTEMS | [2013/01] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET SYSTÈMES D'ÉROSION À EXTRACTION DE DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION | [2013/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 02.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 29.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2013 | 28.02.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2004358595 (DAIWARASHI CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2004230517 (MIKUNI MAKINO KOGYO KK, et al); | [Y]US6225589 (BARTOK STEPHEN [US]) |