Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8793840 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2014 | B2 | US2013175737 | 11.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP64659 | 25.08.2011 | DE102010035944 | 31.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20130098357 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP64659 | 25.08.2011 | DE102010035944 | 31.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013536902 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP64659 | 25.08.2011 | DE102010035944 | 31.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103080398B | Global Dossier | 05.08.2015 | B | CN103080398 | 01.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP64659 | 25.08.2011 | DE102010035944 | 31.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2611956 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2015 | B1 | EP2611956 | 10.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP64659 | 25.08.2011 | DE102010035944 | 31.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2808916 | 08.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP64659 | 25.08.2011 | DE102010035944 | 31.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2611956T | 13.04.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP64659 | 25.08.2011 | DE102010035944 | 31.08.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012028535 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010035944 | 31.08.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102010035944 | 01.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010035944 | 31.08.2010 |