EP2611956 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE DRY FORMING OF A FIBRE WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Leverkuser Strasse 65 42897 Remscheid / DE | [2013/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARZ, Olaf Lilienweg 2 24536 Neumünster / DE | 02 /
MÄHLMANN, Ingo Ferdinand-Sauerbruch-Str. 4 25524 Itzehoe / DE | 03 /
SOGAARD JENSEN, Rune Sondrevej 31 DK-8700 Horsens / DK | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Neumann, Ditmar KNH Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Neumann, Ditmar KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2013/28] | Neumann, Ditmar KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11752176.5 | 25.08.2011 | WO2011EP64659 | Priority number, date | DE20101035944 | 31.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010035944 | [2013/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012028535 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2611956 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2611956 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/736, D01G25/00, D04H1/732 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
D01G25/00 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/732 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/005 (US);
D04H1/736 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/74 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/28] | D04H1/72, D04H1/736, D01G25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TROCKENFORMEN EINER FASERBAHN | [2013/28] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE DRY FORMING OF A FIBRE WEB | [2013/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION À SEC D'UNE BANDE FIBREUSE | [2013/28] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 17.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2011 | AL | 14.01.2015 | CY | 14.01.2015 | CZ | 14.01.2015 | EE | 14.01.2015 | ES | 14.01.2015 | HR | 14.01.2015 | LT | 14.01.2015 | LV | 14.01.2015 | MC | 14.01.2015 | MK | 14.01.2015 | MT | 14.01.2015 | NL | 14.01.2015 | PL | 14.01.2015 | PT | 14.01.2015 | RO | 14.01.2015 | RS | 14.01.2015 | SE | 14.01.2015 | SI | 14.01.2015 | SK | 14.01.2015 | SM | 14.01.2015 | TR | 14.01.2015 | BG | 14.04.2015 | NO | 14.04.2015 | GR | 15.04.2015 | IS | 14.05.2015 | GB | 25.08.2015 | IE | 25.08.2015 | LU | 25.08.2015 | BE | 31.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | FR | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.08.2011 | |
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MK | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PT | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.08.2015 | ||
IE | 25.08.2015 | ||
LU | 25.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 25.08.2011 | |
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.08.2015 | ||
IE | 25.08.2015 | ||
LU | 25.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.08.2015 | ||
IE | 25.08.2015 | ||
LU | 25.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.08.2015 | ||
IE | 25.08.2015 | ||
LU | 25.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
GB | 25.08.2015 | ||
IE | 25.08.2015 | ||
LU | 25.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
IE | 25.08.2015 | ||
LU | 25.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
LU | 25.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
LU | 25.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
LU | 25.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 14.01.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2149892 (INGENJOERS B PROJEKT AB FA); | [A]US5445777 (NOEL JOHN R [US], et al); | [X]WO03016605 (DAN WEB HOLDING AS [DK], et al); | [A]US2005098910 (ANDERSEN CARSTEN [DK]); | [X]WO2005106091 (CONCERT GMBH [DE], et al) | by applicant | WO03016622 | WO2004106604 | WO2006131122 |