EP2551341 - CULTURE METHOD FOR CAUSING DIFFERENTIATION OF PLURIPOTENT MAMMALIAN CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | For all designated states Public University Corporation Yokohama City University 22-2 Seto Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0027 / JP | [2013/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITCHODA, Yoko c/o KURARAY Co., Ltd. 41 Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | 02 /
TAZAKI, Go c/o KURARAY Co., Ltd. 41 Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | 03 /
HOSODA, Masaya c/o KURARAY Co., Ltd. 41 Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | 04 /
FUKUDA, Motohiro c/o KURARAY Co., Ltd. 41 Miyukigaoka Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0841 / JP | 05 /
TANIGUCHI, Hideki c/o Public University Corporation Yokohama City University 3-9-1 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 06 /
ZHENG, Yun-Wen c/o Public University Corporation Yokohama City University 3-9-1 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 07 /
SEKINE, Keisuke c/o Public University Corporation Yokohama City University 3-9-1 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/17] |
Former [2013/05] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11759020.8 | 23.03.2011 | [2017/17] | WO2011JP01708 | Priority number, date | JP20100066324 | 23.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010066324 | [2013/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011118211 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2551341 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2551341 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/32, C12N5/0735 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
C12N5/0606 (EP,US);
C12N5/0018 (KR);
C12M23/12 (EP,US);
C12M3/00 (KR);
C12N5/00 (KR);
C12N5/0056 (KR);
C12N5/0068 (KR);
C12N2502/28 (EP,US);
C12N2506/02 (EP,US);
C12N2535/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/05] | C12N5/071, C12M3/00, C12N5/0735 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KULTURVERFAHREN ZUR HERBEIFÜHRUNG DER DIFFERENZIERUNG PLURIPOTENTER SÄUGETIERZELLEN | [2013/05] | English: | CULTURE METHOD FOR CAUSING DIFFERENTIATION OF PLURIPOTENT MAMMALIAN CELLS | [2013/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CULTURE CAPABLE DE PROVOQUER LA DIFFÉRENTIATION DE CELLULES PLURIPOTENTES DE MAMMIFÈRES | [2013/05] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2012 | Translation filed | 27.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.1924 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/05] | 20.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2011 | AL | 26.04.2017 | AT | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | ES | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | IT | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | MK | 26.04.2017 | NL | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | RS | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | SM | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | NO | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 26.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2008156041 (KURARAY CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [YP]EP2169049 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [YP] 1-22 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0038] *; | [Y]WO2006020919 (UNIV GEORGIA RES FOUND [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * examples 1-3 *; | [IP]DE102009002577 (LEIBNIZ INST POLYMERFORSCHUNG [DE]) [IP] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009150051 (UNIV AARHUS [DK], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | [XI] - Y.-S. HWANG ET AL, "Microwell-mediated control of embryoid body size regulates embryonic stem cell fate via differential expression of WNT5a and WNT11", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20091006), vol. 106, no. 40, doi:10.1073/pnas.0905550106, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 16978 - 16983, XP055067093 [X] 1,2,14-18,20 * figures 1, 3 * [I] 1-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0905550106 | [Y] - MOELLER ET AL, "A microwell array system for stem cell culture", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (20071114), vol. 29, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2007.10.030, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 752 - 763, XP022371128 [Y] 1-22 * figures 1, 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2007.10.030 | [Y] - CÉLINE LIU BAUWENS ET AL, "Control of Human Embryonic Stem Cell Colony and Aggregate Size Heterogeneity Influences Differentiation Trajectories", STEM CELLS, (20080901), vol. 26, no. 9, doi:10.1634/stemcells.2008-0183, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 2300 - 2310, XP055067255 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/stemcells.2008-0183 | [T] - SEKINE K ET AL, "Highly Efficient Generation of Definitive Endoderm Lineage from Human Induced Pluripotent Stem Cells", TRANSPLANTATION PROCEEDINGS, vol. 44, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.TRANSPROCEED.2012.03.001, ISSN 0041-1345, (20120101), pages 1127 - 1129, (20120317), XP028482435 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.transproceed.2012.03.001 | International search | [Y]JP2008509676 (THE UNIVERSITY OF GEORGIA RESEARCH FOUNDATION, INC.); | [Y]WO2008156041 (KURARAY CO [JP], et al); | [XP]WO2010047132 (KURARAY CO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007061096 (LIFESCAN INC) | by applicant | JP2008509676 | - CELINE LIU BAUWENS; RAHEEM PEERANI; SYLVIA NIEBRUEGGE; KIMBERLY A. WOODHOUSE; EUGENIA KUMACHEVA; MANSOOR HUSAIN; PETER W. ZANDSTRA, "Control of Human Embryonic Stem Cell Colony and Aggregate Size Heterogeneity Influences Differentiation Trajectories", STEM CELLS, (2008), vol. 26, doi:doi:10.1634/stemcells.2008-0183, pages 2300 - 2310, XP055067257 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/stemcells.2008-0183 | - HUDSON, C.; CLEMENTS, D.; FRIDAY, R.V.; STOTT, D.; WOODLAND, H.R., "Xsoxl7a and -$ mediate endoderm formation in Xenopus", CELL, (1997), vol. 91, pages 397 - 405 |