EP2577930 - METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIA FOR OBSCURING DIAMETER NODE INFORMATION IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tekelec, Inc. 5200 Paramount Parkway Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | [2020/22] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Tekelec, Inc. 5200 Paramount Parkway Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCANN, Thomas, Matthew 10560 Clubmont Lane Raleigh NC 27617 / US | 02 /
MARSICO, Peter, Joseph 1415 Preston Spring Lane Chapel Hill NC 27516 / US | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2020/22] |
Former [2014/07] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2013/15] | de Zeeuw, Johan Diederick, et al Murgitroyd & Company Immeuble Atlantis 55, Allée Pierre Ziller Sophia Antipolis 06560 Valbonne / FR | Application number, filing date | 11792956.2 | 06.06.2011 | [2020/22] | WO2011US39285 | Priority number, date | US20100367367P | 23.07.2010 Original published format: US 367367 P | US20100351923P | 06.06.2010 Original published format: US 351923 P | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011156274 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2577930 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2577930 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/02, H04L12/28, H04L29/06, H04W4/02, // H04L12/66, H04W12/02, H04L12/24 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
H04W12/02 (EP,US);
H04L65/00 (KR);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04L63/0407 (EP,US);
H04L12/2834 (US);
H04L12/66 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | H04L29/02, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND COMPUTERLESBARE MEDIEN ZUR AUSBLENDUNG VON DIAMETER-KNOTENINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2020/02] | English: | METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTER READABLE MEDIA FOR OBSCURING DIAMETER NODE INFORMATION IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2013/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET SUPPORTS LISIBLES PAR ORDINATEUR DE MASQUAGE D'INFORMATIONS DE NOEUDS DIAMETER DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATIONS | [2020/02] |
Former [2013/15] | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND COMPUTERLESBARE MEDIEN ZUR AUSBLENDUNG VON DURCHMESSERKNOTENINFORMATIONEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | ||
Former [2013/15] | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET SUPPORTS LISIBLES PAR ORDINATEUR DE MASQUAGE D'INFORMATIONS DE N UDS DIAMETER DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 25.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2011 | AL | 27.05.2020 | AT | 27.05.2020 | CY | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | DK | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | ES | 27.05.2020 | FI | 27.05.2020 | HR | 27.05.2020 | IT | 27.05.2020 | LT | 27.05.2020 | LV | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | MK | 27.05.2020 | MT | 27.05.2020 | NL | 27.05.2020 | PL | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | RS | 27.05.2020 | SE | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | SM | 27.05.2020 | TR | 27.05.2020 | IE | 06.06.2020 | LU | 06.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | NO | 27.08.2020 | GR | 28.08.2020 | IS | 27.09.2020 | PT | 28.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 06.06.2011 | |
AL | 27.05.2020 | ||
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
MT | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 27.05.2020 | |
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 27.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1848150 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,11-13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0002] , [ 0005] - [0007] - [ 0009] - [0018] - [ 0020] , [ 0029] - [0047] * * paragraphs [0058] - [0062] * [I] 3,7,10,14; | [XI]WO2007125498 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,12,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0002] , [ 0006] , [ 0008] , [ 0009] , [ 0016] , [ 0018] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] - [ 0033] , [ 0041] - [0044] - [ 0048] , [ 0050] , [ 0053] , [ 0056] * * paragraphs [0058] , [ 0059] , [ 0063] - [0066] *[I] 3,4,6,7,10,11,13,14 | International search | [A]US2005235000 (KEIL WOLFGANG [JP]); | [A]US2006259759 (MAINO FABIO [US], et al); | [A]US2009080440 (BALYAN AVNEESH SINGH [US], et al); | [A]US2009313379 (RYDNELL GUNNAR [SE], et al) | Examination | US2009080440 | by applicant | EP1848150 |