EP2589172 - MULTI-CHANNEL COMMUNICATION STATION FOR COMMUNICATING A MULTI-CHANNEL PPDU AND METHODS OF REDUCING COLLISIONS ON SECONDARY CHANNELS IN MULTI-CHANNEL WIRELESS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/18] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states Intel Corporation MS: RNB-4-150 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Minyoung 12694 NW Milazzo Ln. Portland Oregon 97229 / US | 02 /
STACEY, Robert, J. 2537 SE Stephens St Portland Oregon 97214 / US | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Hufton, David Alan HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2013/42] | Hufton, David Alan Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2013/19] | Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11804098.9 | 27.06.2011 | [2016/18] | WO2011US42052 | Priority number, date | US20100825843 | 29.06.2010 Original published format: US 825843 | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012006035 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2589172 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2589172 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/801, H04J11/00, H04B7/26, H04W74/08, H04L5/00 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
H04L5/0044 (EP,US);
H04W74/0816 (EP,CN,US);
H04L45/24 (EP,US);
H04L45/28 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/26] | H04J11/00, H04B7/26, H04W74/08 | ||
Former IPC [2013/19] | H04J11/00, H04B7/26, H04W74/08, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRKANAL-KOMMUNIKATIONSSTATION ZUR ÜBERMITTLUNG EINER MEHRKANAL-PPDU SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR KOLLISIONSREDUZIERUNG AUF SEKUNDÄRKANÄLEN IN DRAHTLOSEN MEHRKANAL-NETZWERKEN | [2013/19] | English: | MULTI-CHANNEL COMMUNICATION STATION FOR COMMUNICATING A MULTI-CHANNEL PPDU AND METHODS OF REDUCING COLLISIONS ON SECONDARY CHANNELS IN MULTI-CHANNEL WIRELESS NETWORKS | [2013/19] | French: | STATION DE COMMUNICATION MULTIVOIE DESTINÉE À TRANSMETTRE UNE PPDU MULTIVOIE ET PROCÉDÉS DE LIMITATION DES COLLISIONS SUR LES VOIES AUXILIAIRES DANS LES RÉSEAUX SANS FIL MULTIVOIES | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 23.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15185412.2 / EP2983436 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2011 | AL | 04.05.2016 | AT | 04.05.2016 | BE | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | ES | 04.05.2016 | FI | 04.05.2016 | HR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 04.05.2016 | IT | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | MK | 04.05.2016 | PL | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | RS | 04.05.2016 | SE | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | SM | 04.05.2016 | TR | 04.05.2016 | IE | 27.06.2016 | LU | 27.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | NO | 04.08.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 27.06.2011 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 27.06.2016 | ||
LU | 27.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.06.2011 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 27.06.2016 | ||
LU | 27.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 27.06.2011 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 27.06.2016 | ||
LU | 27.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.06.2011 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 27.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 27.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | |
NO | 04.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005006697 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 7, line 13 - line 23 * * page 9, line 13 - line 34; figure 2 *; | [A]US2005025131 (KO SEONG-YUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0028] ** paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0105]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2008019458 (KUO CHUN-CHUN [TW], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0043] * * figures 2,7,10; claim 1 * | International search | [A]US2005068979 (BOER JAN [NL], et al); | [A]US2006146869 (ZHANG NING [US], et al); | [A]US2009190465 (PORAT RON [US], et al); | [A] - YOUHAN KIM, "Enhanced CCA for Non-Primary Channels Using Guard Interval", IEEE 802.11-10/0012R0, (20100107), XP003033142 | [A] - "'Specification Framework for TGac', IEEE P802.11 Wireless LANs", IEEE 802.11-09/0992R11, (201005), XP002661097 | by applicant | US2005025131 | US2008019458 |