|
31.05.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.03.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
17.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
11.01.2013 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.01.2013 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.01.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
11.01.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
11.01.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.01.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.10.2012 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
22.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
21 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
29 |