EP2646169 - DEVICE FOR COATING PAPER OR CARDBOARD WEBS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Horst Sprenger GmbH Pferdsweide 47 47441 Moers / DE | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNOP, Reinhard Hobestatt 77 45279 Essen / DE | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Greif, Thomas, et al Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [2013/41] | Application number, filing date | 11826108.0 | 14.11.2011 | [2017/08] | WO2011EP05726 | Priority number, date | DE20101052649 | 30.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010052649 | [2013/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012072196 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2646169 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2646169 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B05C11/04, B05C1/08, D21H23/56 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
D21H23/56 (EP);
B05C1/083 (EP);
B05C11/041 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/41] | B05C1/08, B05C9/04, B05C11/02, D21H23/32, D21H23/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESCHICHTEN VON PAPIER- ODER KARTONBAHNEN | [2013/41] | English: | DEVICE FOR COATING PAPER OR CARDBOARD WEBS | [2013/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR ENDUIRE DES BANDES DE PAPIER OU DE CARTON | [2013/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 28.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2011 | AL | 22.02.2017 | CY | 22.02.2017 | CZ | 22.02.2017 | DK | 22.02.2017 | EE | 22.02.2017 | ES | 22.02.2017 | FI | 22.02.2017 | HR | 22.02.2017 | IT | 22.02.2017 | LT | 22.02.2017 | LV | 22.02.2017 | MC | 22.02.2017 | MK | 22.02.2017 | MT | 22.02.2017 | NL | 22.02.2017 | PL | 22.02.2017 | RO | 22.02.2017 | RS | 22.02.2017 | SE | 22.02.2017 | SI | 22.02.2017 | SK | 22.02.2017 | SM | 22.02.2017 | TR | 22.02.2017 | BG | 22.05.2017 | NO | 22.05.2017 | GR | 23.05.2017 | IS | 22.06.2017 | PT | 22.06.2017 | AT | 14.11.2017 | GB | 14.11.2017 | IE | 14.11.2017 | LU | 14.11.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 14.11.2011 | |
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
TR | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
AT | 14.11.2017 | ||
GB | 14.11.2017 | ||
IE | 14.11.2017 | ||
LU | 14.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 14.11.2011 | |
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
AT | 14.11.2017 | ||
GB | 14.11.2017 | ||
IE | 14.11.2017 | ||
LU | 14.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 14.11.2011 | |
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
AT | 14.11.2017 | ||
GB | 14.11.2017 | ||
IE | 14.11.2017 | ||
LU | 14.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.11.2011 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
AT | 14.11.2017 | ||
GB | 14.11.2017 | ||
IE | 14.11.2017 | ||
LU | 14.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
AT | 14.11.2017 | ||
GB | 14.11.2017 | ||
IE | 14.11.2017 | ||
LU | 14.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
GB | 14.11.2017 | ||
IE | 14.11.2017 | ||
LU | 14.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.11.2017 | ||
LU | 14.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
PL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.02.2017 | |
ES | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | ES | 22.02.2017 | |
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
NL | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5858090 (GOTTWALD INGO [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0029865 (ZANDERS FEINPAPIERE AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * page 5, line 22 - page 11, line 33; figures 1-5; claims 1-8 *; | [A]US4279949 (ESSER REINHARD) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | Examination | DE3614582 | DE19926956 | by applicant | DE102004039162 | DE19826647 |