19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
07.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
27.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
06.05.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
29.05.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
26.05.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.05.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.05.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.02.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.02.2015 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
17.02.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.01.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
30.01.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
30.01.2015 |
Change - German title |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
11.11.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.04.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
11.04.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
11.04.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
20.12.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] |
13.12.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
01.11.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
28.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.07.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
19.07.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.03.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.02.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|