Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101437822B | Global Dossier | 05.09.2014 | B1 | KR20140079485 | 26.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010231669 | 14.10.2010 | WO2011JP73695 | 14.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101432454B | Global Dossier | 20.08.2014 | B1 | KR20130100966 | 12.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010231669 | 14.10.2010 | WO2011JP73695 | 14.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103228881B | Global Dossier | 24.08.2016 | B | CN103228881 | 31.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010231669 | 14.10.2010 | WO2011JP73695 | 14.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2628911 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2015 | B1 | EP2628911 | 14.05.2014 | A4 | EP2628911 | 21.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010231669 | 14.10.2010 | WO2011JP73695 | 14.10.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012050196 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010231669 | 14.10.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5839791B | Global Dossier | 06.01.2016 | B2 | JP2012082796 | 26.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010231669 | 14.10.2010 |