Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.03.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
26.05.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.04.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.12.2013 | Change - extension states | published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] |
02.08.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
02.08.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
15.07.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.06.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.05.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.05.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.05.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.05.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.05.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication |