Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013267929 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010238885 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011JP62102 | 26.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2012056756 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010238885 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011JP62102 | 26.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2633880 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010238885 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011JP62102 | 26.05.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012056756 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010238885 | 25.10.2010 |