EP2543634 - TRANSPARENT ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE LAMINATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2013/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OI, Takashi c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Osamu c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
HONDO, Kazunori c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 04 /
NISHINO, Hidekazu c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 05 /
SATO, Kenichi c/o Shiga Plant, Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Hager, Thomas Johannes, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11836454.6 | 28.10.2011 | WO2011JP74944 | Priority number, date | JP20110155939 | 14.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011155939 | JP20110121497 | 31.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011121497 | JP20110074643 | 30.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011074643 | JP20100243737 | 29.10.2010 Original published format: JP 2010243737 | [2013/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012057321 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | JA | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2543634 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01F11/02, B05D5/12, H01B1/04, H01B1/24 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
H01B1/24 (EP,US);
H01B1/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01F31/80 (KR,US);
B05D5/12 (US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/05 (EP,US);
C01B32/174 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/041 (KR);
H01B13/30 (EP,KR,US);
H01B13/322 (KR);
H01B5/14 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2013/02] | C01B31/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Title | German: | TRANSPARENTES ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGES LAMINAT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2013/02] | English: | TRANSPARENT ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE LAMINATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2013/02] | French: | LAMINÉ TRANSPARENT ÉLECTROCONDUCTEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2013/02] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2012 | Translation filed | 22.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 25.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008138589 (WAKABAYASHI NAOHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-7,12,13 * paragraphs [0052] , [0056] , [0081]; figure 1; claims 6,23 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0029] , [0049] , [0069] , [0118] , [0119] , [0125] , [0145] *; | [X]US2009001326 (SATO KENICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1* paragraphs [0011] , [0053] , [0058] , [0063] , [0092] , [0166] , [0172] , [0185] , [0207]; table 1 *; | [XYI]JP2009301799 (SHARP KK) [X] 1-4 * claim 1; table 2 * [Y] 8-11 [I] 12,13; | [XY]WO2010101205 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0212] , [0213] , [0221] , [0229]; example all; table 1 * * paragraphs [0127] - [0133] - [0137] * * paragraphs [0251] , [0252] , [0325] , [0334]; tables 1,2 * [Y] 8-11 | International search | [A]JP2008177143 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2009242144 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2009295378 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2010043237 (KOREA ELECTROTECH RES INST) | by applicant | JP2009149516 | WO2009107758 | JP2010005817 |