Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2546139 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2015 | B1 | EP2546139 | 16.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011107027 | 09.07.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102011107027 | 28.10.2021 | B4 | DE102011107027 | 10.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011107027 | 09.07.2011 |