EP2679122 - Blade tool arrangement for a kitchen device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2014/01] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pesec, Jurij Petrovce 3 3301Petrovce / SI | 02 /
Rudez, Darko Podgrad 16a 3230 Sentjur / SI | 03 /
Zilnik, Marko Suhadole 37B 1218 Komenda / SI | [2014/01] | Application number, filing date | 12004866.5 | 29.06.2012 | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2679122 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2679122 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/07 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
A47J43/0722 (EP,RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2014/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Klingenwerkzeuganordnung für ein Küchengerät | [2014/01] | English: | Blade tool arrangement for a kitchen device | [2014/01] | French: | Agencement d'outil à lame pour dispositif de cuisine | [2014/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 16.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2012 | AL | 04.01.2017 | AT | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | ES | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | IT | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | MK | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | RS | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | SM | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | IE | 29.06.2017 | LU | 29.06.2017 | MT | 29.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
TR | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
MT | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
MT | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
MT | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.06.2012 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
MT | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
MT | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2608034 (ROBOT COUPE SA [FR]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US6532863 (LEE MING-TSUNG [TW]) [X] 1-15 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US4307847 (SONTHEIMER CARL G) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US8132752 (HOTALING BRYAN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US8056848 (LIANG KAI-FU [TW]) [X] 1-15 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | US5097727 | US2825968 | US3741046 | US3321874 | FR2907362 |