EP2617608 - Pedestrian airbag arrangement on a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuntzsch, Stefan Västersannum Nordgården 2 SE-524 96 Ljung / SE | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Parry, Simon James Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Parry, Simon James Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12152166.0 | 23.01.2012 | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2617608 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/36 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
B60R21/36 (EP);
B60R2021/23107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fussgänger-Airbaganordnung an einem Kraftfahrzeug | [2013/30] | English: | Pedestrian airbag arrangement on a motor vehicle | [2013/30] | French: | Agencement d'airbag piéton sur un véhicule à moteur | [2013/30] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/35] | 12.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE102006042375 (DAIMLER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-13 * figure 5; claims 7, 10 * [Y] 8,14,15; | [X]EP2070778 (TAKATA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-13 * paragraph [0060]; figure 21 *; | [X]DE19803165 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-12 * abstract *; | [X]JPH07156749 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * abstract *; | [Y]DE10353447 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 8,14,15 * paragraph [0028]; figure 3 * |