12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
01.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
03.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
09.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
04.07.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
28.03.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
10.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
18.10.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
27.09.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
26.07.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
18.03.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.03.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.01.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.01.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
07.12.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] |
30.10.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |