EP2517974 - Drink bottle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nürnberg Gummi Babyartikel GmbH & Co. KG Breitenloher Weg 6 91166 Georgensgmünd / DE | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜHRLE, Matthäus Weidenweg 7 91166 Georgensgmünd / DE | 02 /
Rößl, Stefan Klingenberg 13 91522 Ansbach / DE | [2013/47] |
Former [2013/44] | 01 /
BÜHRLE, Matthäus Weidenweg 7 91166 Georgensgmünd / DE | ||
02 /
Rössl, Stefan Klingenberg 13 91522 Ansbach / DE | |||
Former [2012/44] | 01 /
BÜHRLE, Matthäus Weidenweg 7 91166 Georgensgmünd / DE | Representative(s) | Blaumeier, Jörg Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Blaumeier, Jörg Lindner Blaumeier Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12158168.0 | 06.03.2012 | [2012/44] | Priority number, date | DE20111018822 | 27.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011018822 | [2012/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2517974 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2517974 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/24 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
B65D47/243 (EP);
B65D47/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Title | German: | Trinkflasche | [2012/44] | English: | Drink bottle | [2012/44] | French: | Bouteille à boire | [2012/44] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 21.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2012 | AL | 28.08.2013 | BG | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | CZ | 28.08.2013 | DK | 28.08.2013 | EE | 28.08.2013 | ES | 28.08.2013 | FI | 28.08.2013 | HR | 28.08.2013 | IT | 28.08.2013 | LT | 28.08.2013 | LV | 28.08.2013 | MC | 28.08.2013 | MK | 28.08.2013 | MT | 28.08.2013 | NL | 28.08.2013 | PL | 28.08.2013 | RO | 28.08.2013 | RS | 28.08.2013 | SE | 28.08.2013 | SI | 28.08.2013 | SK | 28.08.2013 | SM | 28.08.2013 | TR | 28.08.2013 | NO | 28.11.2013 | GR | 29.11.2013 | IS | 28.12.2013 | PT | 30.12.2013 | IE | 06.03.2014 | LU | 06.03.2014 | BE | 31.03.2014 | FR | 31.03.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 06.03.2012 | |
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
RS | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 06.03.2012 | |
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
RS | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.03.2012 | |
BG | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
RS | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
RS | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
IE | 06.03.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
CZ | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 28.08.2013 | |
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | FI | 28.08.2013 | |
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 28.08.2013 | |
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 28.08.2013 | |
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 28.08.2013 | |
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
PT | 30.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 28.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010012686 (JOEHNK TERRENCE [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102005025561 (GEORG MENSHEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03089326 (SEAQUIST LOEFFLER KUNSTSTOFFWERK GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US6006952 (LUCAS MONTY J [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 4, lines 52-67 *; | [A]US6769575 (LONG JR CHARLES J [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 6 * * column 6, line 37 - column 8, line 3 * | by applicant | DE4495238 |