EP2505383 - A flanged bearing ring for the hub of a motor vehicle wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Re, Paolo Via Superga 46/20 I-10042 Nichelino (Torino) / IT | 02 /
Knopf, Andreas Mariannhillstraße 2C 97074 Würzburg / DE | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Tedeschini, Luca SKF Industrie S.p.A. Via Pinerolo, 44 10060 Airasca (TO) / IT | [2013/48] |
Former [2012/40] | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 12161719.5 | 28.03.2012 | [2012/40] | Priority number, date | IT2011TO00279 | 29.03.2011 Original published format: IT TO20110279 | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2505383 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2505383 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60B27/00, B22D19/04, F16C33/64 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
B60B27/0005 (EP,US);
B22D19/04 (EP,US);
B60B27/0073 (EP,US);
F16C33/60 (EP,US);
F16C33/64 (EP,US);
B60B2360/102 (EP,US);
B60B2360/104 (EP,US);
B60B2360/32 (EP,US);
B60B2900/5114 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/11 (EP,US);
F16C19/184 (EP,US);
F16C2220/04 (EP,US);
F16C2326/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/40] | Title | German: | Lagerring mit Flansch für eine Fahrzeugradnabe und Herstellmethode dafür | [2012/40] | English: | A flanged bearing ring for the hub of a motor vehicle wheel | [2012/40] | French: | Anneau de roulement avec bride pour le moyeu d'une roue d'un véhicule et une méthode de fabrication de même | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 12.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2012 | AL | 15.01.2014 | AT | 15.01.2014 | BE | 15.01.2014 | BG | 15.01.2014 | CY | 15.01.2014 | CZ | 15.01.2014 | DK | 15.01.2014 | EE | 15.01.2014 | ES | 15.01.2014 | FI | 15.01.2014 | HR | 15.01.2014 | LT | 15.01.2014 | LV | 15.01.2014 | MC | 15.01.2014 | MK | 15.01.2014 | MT | 15.01.2014 | NL | 15.01.2014 | PL | 15.01.2014 | RO | 15.01.2014 | RS | 15.01.2014 | SI | 15.01.2014 | SK | 15.01.2014 | SM | 15.01.2014 | TR | 15.01.2014 | IE | 28.03.2014 | LU | 28.03.2014 | NO | 15.04.2014 | GR | 16.04.2014 | IS | 15.05.2014 | PT | 15.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.03.2012 | |
AT | 15.01.2014 | ||
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MK | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
RS | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
TR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 28.03.2012 | |
AT | 15.01.2014 | ||
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
RS | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
TR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.03.2012 | |
AT | 15.01.2014 | ||
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
RS | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
RS | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
RS | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
RS | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
RS | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
RS | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
RS | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
RS | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.03.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
RS | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
RS | 15.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RS | 15.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.03.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RS | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 15.01.2014 | |
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2008147284 (SKF AB [SE], et al) [AD] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]WO2010063299 (SKF AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0297552 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0041]; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2008147284 |