Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2540437T | 30.11.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12174012 | 28.06.2012 | FR1102036 | 30.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9108277 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2015 | B2 | US2013001275 | 03.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1102036 | 30.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102012979B | Global Dossier | 21.08.2019 | B1 | KR20130004171 | 09.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1102036 | 30.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6272636B | Global Dossier | 31.01.2018 | B2 | JP2013016802 | 24.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1102036 | 30.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2540437 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2018 | B1 | EP2540437 | 02.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1102036 | 30.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2977178 | 16.05.2014 | B1 | FR2977178 | 04.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1102036 | 30.06.2011 |