EP2695575 - Waterproof physiological signal detection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states King's Metal Fiber Technologies Co., Ltd. No. 195, Dongbei Street Fengyuan District Taichung City / TW | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Su, I-Chen 8F., No. 426, Linsen N. Rd., Zhongshan Dist. Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Huang, Hong-Hsu 8F., No. 426, Linsen N. Rd., Zhongshan Dist. Taipei City / TW | 03 /
Yang, Shun-Tung 8F., No. 426, Linsen N. Rd., Zhongshan Dist. Taipei City / TW | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12179823.5 | 09.08.2012 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2695575 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0408 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
A61B5/259 (EP);
A61B5/25 (EP);
A61B5/291 (EP);
A61B2562/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wasserfeste physiologische Signalerkennungsvorrichtung | [2014/07] | English: | Waterproof physiological signal detection device | [2014/07] | French: | Dispositif étanche de détection de signal physiologique | [2014/07] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 18.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003176908 (LIN HSIN-YI [TW]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2010130846 (RYTKY PEKKA [FI]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2011157821 (EMPA [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 26 - page 7, line 9 ** figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2012007384 (CECOTEPE ASBL [BE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * |