EP2527713 - Ramp rate blender [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cohen, Joseph Perry 1048 Woodmere Drive Bethlehem, PA 18017 / US | 02 /
Heydorn, Edward Clyde 3077 Sequoia Drive Macungie, PA 18062 / US | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2012/48] | Hatt, Anna Louise Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 12180885.1 | 19.01.2007 | [2012/48] | Priority number, date | US20060336218 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: US 336218 | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2527713 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2527713 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F17C5/00, G05D11/13, G05D23/13, B01F3/02, C01B3/02, F17C7/00 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
C01B3/02 (EP,US);
B01F23/191 (EP,US);
G05D11/132 (EP,US);
G05D23/138 (EP,US);
G05D23/1393 (EP,US);
Y02E60/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/48] | Title | German: | Gasmischer mit Durchflussanstiegsrate | [2012/48] | English: | Ramp rate blender | [2012/48] | French: | Mélangeur de gaz à débit accéléré | [2012/48] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 25.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07250213.1 / EP1811224 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070250213) is 30.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2007 | AT | 04.12.2013 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | CZ | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | FI | 04.12.2013 | LT | 04.12.2013 | LV | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | PL | 04.12.2013 | RO | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | SK | 04.12.2013 | TR | 04.12.2013 | IE | 19.01.2014 | LU | 19.01.2014 | GR | 05.03.2014 | IS | 04.04.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.01.2007 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.01.2014 | ||
LU | 19.01.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.01.2014 | ||
LU | 19.01.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.01.2014 | ||
LU | 19.01.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.01.2014 | ||
LU | 19.01.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.01.2014 | ||
LU | 19.01.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.01.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.01.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 04.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3721253 (REMKE M) [I] 1,6-15* the whole document *; | [XI]US4277254 (HANSON ROBERT C) [X] 1,6,10,11 * the whole document * [I] 7-9,12-15; | [I]US4621927 (HIROI KAZUO [JP]) [I] 1,6-15 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 47 * * column 9, lines 23-55; figures 1,6 *; | [Y]US5358177 (CASHMORE PETER R [GB]) [Y] 1-5,10-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5394704 (JOHNSON KENNETH R [US]) [Y] 1-5,10-15 * column 5, line 63 - column 7, line 6; figures 1A,1B *; | [I]US5476115 (LALUMANDIER STEVEN R [US], et al) [I] 1,6-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5139002 | US5771948 | US6786245 | US6810925 | US20050247561 |