|
01.09.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
27.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2020 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
27.07.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.07.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2020 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
06.03.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.05.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.03.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.08.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2013 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2012 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |