Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9428331 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2016 | B2 | US2014367388 | 18.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414470845 | 27.08.2014 | US201113239579 | 22.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8844751 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2014 | B2 | US2013075406 | 28.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113239579 | 22.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103112674B | Global Dossier | 28.10.2015 | B | CN103112674 | 22.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113239579 | 22.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012216483B | Global Dossier | 04.02.2016 | B2 | AU2012216483 | 11.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113239579 | 22.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2573009 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2020 | B1 | EP2573009 | 27.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113239579 | 22.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2789918 | 31.03.2015 | C | CA2789918 | 22.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113239579 | 22.09.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2845273T | 26.07.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201113239579 | 22.09.2011 |