Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013176896 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213476202 | 21.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013122700 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261598254 | 13.02.2012 | US201213443266 | 10.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009097380 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9775608 | 17.09.2008 | US36114809 | 28.01.2009 | US2448908 | 29.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009075933 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3043908 | 21.02.2008 | US18393008 | 31.07.2008 | US1361907 | 13.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009075932 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3043908 | 21.02.2008 | US20480608 | 05.09.2008 | US1361907 | 13.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008112437 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2008 | A3 | WO2008112437 | 18.09.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US93489707 | 05.11.2007 | US89503907 | 15.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017281924 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93489707 | 05.11.2007 | US89503907 | 15.03.2007 | US201715630657 | 22.06.2017 | US201113326696 | 15.12.2011 | US36114809 | 28.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015038921 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3043908 | 21.02.2008 | US18393008 | 31.07.2008 | US1361907 | 13.12.2007 | US201414515946 | 16.10.2014 | US201213476202 | 21.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015038783 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3043908 | 21.02.2008 | US201414516005 | 16.10.2014 | US18393008 | 31.07.2008 | US1361907 | 13.12.2007 | US201213476202 | 21.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9402986 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2016 | B2 | US2015038782 | 05.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3043908 | 21.02.2008 | US18393008 | 31.07.2008 | US1361907 | 13.12.2007 | US201414515975 | 16.10.2014 | US201213476202 | 21.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015038781 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3043908 | 21.02.2008 | US18393008 | 31.07.2008 | US201414515915 | 16.10.2014 | US1361907 | 13.12.2007 | US201213476202 | 21.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014350580 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3043908 | 21.02.2008 | US9775608 | 17.09.2008 | US18393008 | 31.07.2008 | US1361907 | 13.12.2007 | US201261598254 | 13.02.2012 | US201213443266 | 10.04.2012 | US36114809 | 28.01.2009 | US201414452916 | 06.08.2014 | US201213476202 | 21.05.2012 | US2448908 | 29.01.2008 | US201361877232 | 12.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014236197 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213443266 | 10.04.2012 | US201414255446 | 17.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013190783 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93489707 | 05.11.2007 | US89503907 | 15.03.2007 | US201113326696 | 15.12.2011 | US36114809 | 28.01.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8940017 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2015 | B2 | US2012232334 | 13.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18393008 | 31.07.2008 | US201213476202 | 21.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012215237 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93489707 | 05.11.2007 | US201113326696 | 15.12.2011 | US36114809 | 28.01.2009 | US201213450676 | 19.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012209301 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3043908 | 21.02.2008 | US18393008 | 31.07.2008 | US201213443266 | 10.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8551183 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2013 | B2 | US2012065650 | 15.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93489707 | 05.11.2007 | US89503907 | 15.03.2007 | US201113302115 | 22.11.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8734526 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2014 | B2 | US2012065463 | 15.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9775608 | 17.09.2008 | US201113302134 | 22.11.2011 | US36114809 | 28.01.2009 | US2448908 | 29.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8343232 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2013 | B2 | US2012053602 | 01.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9775608 | 17.09.2008 | US36114809 | 28.01.2009 | US201113291535 | 08.11.2011 | US2448908 | 29.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9439746 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2016 | B2 | US2009216253 | 27.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3043908 | 21.02.2008 | US18393008 | 31.07.2008 | US1361907 | 13.12.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009216075 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3043908 | 21.02.2008 | US20480608 | 05.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009192530 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9775608 | 17.09.2008 | US36114809 | 28.01.2009 | US2448908 | 29.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8556988 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2013 | B2 | US2008287970 | 20.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93489707 | 05.11.2007 | US89503907 | 15.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10159553 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2018 | B2 | US2013245650 | 19.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313897703 | 20.05.2013 | US9775608 | 17.09.2008 | US36114809 | 28.01.2009 | US2448908 | 29.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015506780 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261598254 | 13.02.2012 | US201213443266 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US20984 | 10.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2814400 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2015 | A4 | EP2814400 | 24.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261598254 | 13.02.2012 | US201213443266 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US20984 | 10.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2666440 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2016 | A3 | EP2666440 | 27.11.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113326696 | 15.12.2011 | US201213450676 | 19.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2244665 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2015 | A4 | EP2244665 | 03.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9775608 | 17.09.2008 | WO2009US32326 | 29.01.2009 | US36114809 | 28.01.2009 | US2448908 | 29.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2231064 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2014 | A4 | EP2231064 | 29.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3043908 | 21.02.2008 | US18393008 | 31.07.2008 | US1361907 | 13.12.2007 | WO2008US79106 | 07.10.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2120783 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2021 | B1 | EP2120783 | 04.04.2012 | A4 | EP2120783 | 25.11.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US93489707 | 05.11.2007 | US89503907 | 15.03.2007 | WO2008US55220 | 28.02.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104203123 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261598254 | 13.02.2012 | US201213443266 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US20984 | 10.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013219907 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261598254 | 13.02.2012 | US201213443266 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US20984 | 10.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014019948 | 11.07.2017 | A8 | BR112014019948 | 20.06.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261598254 | 13.02.2012 | US201213443266 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US20984 | 10.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2856018 | 22.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261598254 | 13.02.2012 | US201213443266 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US20984 | 10.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2014005425 | 23.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261598254 | 13.02.2012 | US201213443266 | 10.04.2012 | WO2013US20984 | 10.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2604221 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113326696 | 15.12.2011 |