19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
25.10.2019 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
28.07.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
21.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
07.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
21.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
19.08.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
17.08.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.08.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.08.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.05.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
31.03.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.03.2016 |
Change - inventor |
|
26.02.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] |
26.02.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] |
12.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.06.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.07.2014 [2014/29] |
13.06.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 16.07.2014 [2014/29] |
06.06.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.12.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |