Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9859705 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2018 | B2 | US2015180231 | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12275084 | 01.06.2012 | WO2013EP61313 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2856601 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13728991 | 31.05.2013 | EP12275084 | 01.06.2012 | WO2013EP61313 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104508934B | Global Dossier | 26.04.2017 | B | CN104508934 | 08.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12275084 | 01.06.2012 | WO2013EP61313 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2874697 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2018 | C | CA2874697 | 05.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12275084 | 01.06.2012 | WO2013EP61313 | 31.05.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013178807 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12275084 | 01.06.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2670013 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2016 | B1 | EP2670013 | 04.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12275084 | 01.06.2012 |