19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
03.06.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
04.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
22.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
26.06.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] |
23.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2015 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
18.05.2015 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
10.04.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
20.02.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
17.12.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.12.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.12.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.09.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.12.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
08.11.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
04.01.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|