EP2672491 - Cable with resistant covering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 8, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | [2013/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gonnet, Jean-Marc Bärenschanzstr. 2 90429 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Haller, Daniel Urlasstrasse 18 91207 Lauf / DE | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Döring, Roger, et al Patentanwalt Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | [2015/31] |
Former [2013/50] | Döring, Roger, et al Patentanwalt Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12305637.6 | 06.06.2012 | [2013/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2672491 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2672491 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01B13/14, B29C47/12 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
H01B13/141 (EP,US);
B29C48/06 (EP,US);
B29C48/131 (EP,US);
B29C48/304 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0077 (EP);
H01B7/188 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Title | German: | Kabel mit widerstandsfähig hergestelltem Mantel | [2013/50] | English: | Cable with resistant covering | [2013/50] | French: | Câbles avec gaines résistantes | [2013/50] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 03.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Request for further processing for: | 11.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.05.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2012 | AL | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | HR | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | MK | 29.07.2015 | MT | 29.07.2015 | NL | 29.07.2015 | PL | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | RS | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | SM | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | NO | 29.10.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 06.06.2012 | |
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 06.06.2012 | |
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 06.06.2012 | |
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.06.2012 | |
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 29.07.2015 | |
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2583026 (BERNARD SWIFT) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]JPS59187831 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [X] 14-17* abstract *; | [X]US2004065979 (WANG JAMES C [US]) [X] 12-17 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0118]; figures 21,22 * | by applicant | US7057113 | EP2367177 |