EP2807857 - HANDOVER OF EMERGENCY CALLS FROM A CIRCUIT SWITCHED TO A PACKET SWITCHED ACCESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/26] |
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLER, Ralf Talblick 22 52146 Würselen / DE | 02 /
LINDHOLM, Fredrik Hornsbergsvägen 18 S-112 15 Stockholm / SE | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2017/26] |
Former [2014/49] | Lind, Robert Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 12701890.1 | 27.01.2012 | [2017/26] | WO2012EP51343 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013110347 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2807857 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2807857 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, H04W4/22 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
H04W36/00226 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/49] | H04W36/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERGABE VON NOTRUFEN VON EINEM LEITUNGSVERMITTELTEN AUF EIN PAKETVERMITTELTES ZUGANGSNETZ | [2014/49] | English: | HANDOVER OF EMERGENCY CALLS FROM A CIRCUIT SWITCHED TO A PACKET SWITCHED ACCESS NETWORK | [2014/49] | French: | TRANSFERT INTERCELLULAIRE D'APPELS D'URGENCE D'UN RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS À COMMUTATION DE CIRCUITS À UN RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS À COMMUTATION DE PAQUETS | [2014/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 30.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 27.08.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.09.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2012 | AL | 28.06.2017 | AT | 28.06.2017 | CY | 28.06.2017 | CZ | 28.06.2017 | DK | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | ES | 28.06.2017 | FI | 28.06.2017 | HR | 28.06.2017 | IT | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | MK | 28.06.2017 | PL | 28.06.2017 | PT | 28.06.2017 | RO | 28.06.2017 | RS | 28.06.2017 | SE | 28.06.2017 | SI | 28.06.2017 | SK | 28.06.2017 | SM | 28.06.2017 | TR | 28.06.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | NO | 28.09.2017 | GR | 29.09.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | IE | 27.01.2018 | LU | 27.01.2018 | MT | 27.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | FR | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.01.2012 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
MT | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 27.01.2012 | |
AT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
MT | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
MT | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
MT | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 28.06.2017 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2011141979 (KELLER RALF [DE], et al); |