EP2680774 - FLUORESCENT HANDPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gustavsson, Morgan, Lars Ake 1000 Bristol Street North 17 347 Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | [2014/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2014/02] | Application number, filing date | 12752023.7 | 28.02.2012 | [2016/23] | WO2012US27035 | Priority number, date | US201161447654P | 28.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161447654 P | US201161513394P | 29.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161513394 P | [2014/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012118862 | Date: | 07.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2680774 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2680774 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18, // A61B18/00, A61N5/06, A61B18/20 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
A61B18/18 (EP,US);
A61B18/22 (EP,US);
A61B18/203 (EP);
A61B2018/00011 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00047 (EP);
A61B2018/00458 (EP);
A61B2018/0047 (EP);
A61B2018/00476 (EP);
A61B2018/00922 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1807 (EP,US);
A61B2018/206 (EP,US);
A61N2005/005 (EP);
A61N2005/063 (EP);
A61N2005/0644 (EP);
A61N2005/0654 (EP);
A61N2005/0665 (EP);
A61N5/0616 (EP);
A61N5/0617 (EP);
F04C2270/0421 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/02] | A61B18/18, A61B18/22, A61N5/00, A61N5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUORESZIERENDES HANDSTÜCK | [2014/02] | English: | FLUORESCENT HANDPIECE | [2014/02] | French: | PIÈCE À MAIN FLUORESCENTE | [2014/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 14.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2012 | AL | 08.06.2016 | AT | 08.06.2016 | BE | 08.06.2016 | BG | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | DK | 08.06.2016 | EE | 08.06.2016 | FI | 08.06.2016 | HR | 08.06.2016 | LT | 08.06.2016 | LV | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | MK | 08.06.2016 | NL | 08.06.2016 | RO | 08.06.2016 | RS | 08.06.2016 | SE | 08.06.2016 | SI | 08.06.2016 | SK | 08.06.2016 | SM | 08.06.2016 | TR | 08.06.2016 | NO | 08.09.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | IS | 08.10.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | CH | 28.02.2017 | IE | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | LU | 28.02.2017 | MT | 28.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.02.2012 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
MT | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.02.2012 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
MT | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 28.02.2012 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
MT | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.02.2012 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
MT | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 08.06.2016 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
MT | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
MT | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 08.06.2016 | |
NO | 08.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6547781 (FURUMOTO HORACE W [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 3 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0586353 (GUSTAVSSON MORGAN [SE]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, lines 27-32 * | International search | [A]US2009182397 (GUSTAVSSON MORGAN LARS AKE [US]); | [A]US2009059617 (GUSTAVSSON MORGAN LARS AKE [US]); | [A]US2008188914 (GUSTAVSSON MORGAN LARS AKE [US]); | [A]US2009036953 (GUSTAVSSON MORGAN LARS AKE [US]) | by applicant | US5320618 |