EP2758735 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING TWO PURIFIED PARTIAL AIR STREAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | [2014/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALEKSEEV, Alexander Ahornstrasse 6a 82515 Wolfratshausen / DE | 02 /
GOLOUBEV, Dimitri Rümannstr. 17 80804 München / DE | [2014/31] | Representative(s) | Imhof, Dietmar Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Imhof, Dietmar Linde AG Legal Services Intellectual Property Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 12766000.9 | 20.09.2012 | WO2012EP03945 | Priority number, date | DE201110113666 | 20.09.2011 Original published format: DE102011113666 | EP20110008618 | 27.10.2011 Original published format: EP 11008618 | [2014/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013053425 | Date: | 18.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2758735 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/04 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
F25J3/0486 (EP,US);
F25J3/04 (US);
F25J3/04018 (EP,US);
F25J3/0409 (EP,US);
F25J3/04157 (EP,US);
F25J3/04169 (EP,US);
F25J3/04181 (EP,US);
F25J3/04206 (EP,US);
F25J3/04218 (EP,US);
F25J3/04303 (EP,US);
F25J3/04309 (EP,US);
F25J3/04448 (EP,US);
F25J3/04878 (EP,US);
F25J3/04884 (EP,US);
F25J3/04957 (EP,US);
F25J2200/54 (EP,US);
F25J2205/32 (EP,US);
F25J2205/34 (EP,US);
F25J2205/62 (EP,US);
F25J2210/06 (US);
F25J2230/04 (EP,US);
F25J2230/40 (EP,US);
F25J2235/52 (EP,US);
F25J2250/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG ZWEIER GEREINIGTER LUFTTEILSTRÖME | [2014/31] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING TWO PURIFIED PARTIAL AIR STREAMS | [2014/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE DEUX COURANTS D'AIR PARTIELS PURIFIÉS | [2014/31] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 19.03.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1028254 (LEUNA WERKE VEB) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4662916 (AGRAWAL RAKESH [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 1 * * column 6, lines 34-56; figure 4 *; | [Y]US6453659 (LIERE JACOBUS VAN [NL], et al) [Y] 1-4 * figure 3 *; | [Y]FR2878294 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [Y] 1-4 * page 1, lines 25-30; figure 2 *; | [A]DE102007027073 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 2 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017]; figure . *; | [A]DE202008012985U (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1,4* paragraphs [0006] , [0009] , [0011] , [0020]; figure 2 *; | [Y]FR2946099 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [Y] 1-4 * page 3, lines 17-26; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0342436 |