Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2773458

EP2773458 - CATALYTIC MEMBRANES AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.08.2014
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.10.2017New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Board of Trustees of The University of Arkansas
2404 N. University Avenue
Little Rock, AR 72207-3608 / US
[2014/37]
Inventor(s)01 / WICKRAMASINGHE, Sumith, Ranil
2373 Cato Springs Boulevard
Fayetteville, AR 72703 / US
02 / QIAN, Xianghong
2373 Covington Park Boulevard
Fayetteville, AR 72703 / US
03 / ULBRICHT, Mathias
Danneckerstr. 6
10245 Berlin / DE
04 / YANG, Qian
Harkortsr. 12
45145 Essen / DE
 [2014/37]
Representative(s)Phillips & Leigh LLP
5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/37]Phillips & Leigh
5 Pemberton Row
London EC4A 3BA / GB
Application number, filing date12783811.831.10.2012
WO2012US62690
Priority number, dateUS201161553547P31.10.2011         Original published format: US 201161553547 P
[2014/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013066941
Date:10.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2773458
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013
[2014/37]
Search report(s)International search reportEP10.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:B01J31/10, B01J31/02, B01J31/06, C12P7/00, C13K1/02, B01D61/00, C07H3/00, B01J35/06
[2014/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/37]
TitleGerman:KATALYTISCHE MEMBRANEN UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON[2014/37]
English:CATALYTIC MEMBRANES AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF[2014/37]
French:MEMBRANES CATALYTIQUES ET LEURS APPLICATIONS[2014/37]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2014National basic fee paid 
15.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/37]
16.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]EP2033974  (UNIV BELFAST [GB]) [A] 1-19,23-29 * the whole document *;
 [I]  - AMARASEKARA A S ET AL, "Synthesis of a sulfonic acid functionalized acidic ionic liquid modified silica catalyst and applications in the hydrolysis of cellulose", CATALYSIS COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 11, no. 13, ISSN 1566-7367, (20100726), pages 1072 - 1075, (20100526), XP027153533 [I] 1-7,17,23 * Paragraphs 3.3, 4;; figure 1 * * the whole document *
 [A]  - QIANG ZHANG, ET AL, "A silica gel supported dual acidic ionic liquid: an efficient and recyclable heterogeneous catalyst for the one-pot synthesis of amidoalkyl naphthols", GREEN CHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 12, pages 2246 - 2254, XP002689977 [A] 1-7 * Scheme 2; paragraphs 2.1, 4.2.3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0gc00472c
 [A]  - KUN QIAO, ET AL, "Acidic ionic liquid modified silica gel as novel solid catalyst for esterification and nitration reaction", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL, (2006), vol. 246, page 65-69, XP002689978 [A] 1-7 * Schemes 1, 2; paragraphs 2.1-2.5, 3.1, 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.MOLCATA.2005.07.031
 [A]  - AMARASEKARA A S, ET AL, "Hydrolysis and decomposition of cellulose in Brönsted acidic ionic liquids under mild conditions", IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (2009), vol. 48, pages 10152 - 10155, XP002689979 [A] 1-19,23-30 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/IE901047U
 [A]  - CHANGZHI LI, ET AL, "Acid in ionic liquid: an efficient system for hydrolysis of lignocellulose", GREEN CHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 10, pages 177 - 182, XP002689980 [A] 1-19,23-30 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B711512A
by applicant   - C. BREUIL; J.N. SADDLER, "Comparison of the 3,5-dinitrosalicylic acid and Nelson-Somogyi methods of assaying for reducing sugars and determining cellulase activity", ENZYME AND MICROB. TECHNOL., (1985), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1016/0141-0229(85)90111-5, page 327, XP023679173

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-0229(85)90111-5