12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
07.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
17.03.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] |
30.12.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] |
23.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
16.12.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
19.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
12.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
29.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
27.05.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
22.01.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
15.12.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.12.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.08.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.07.2015 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
29.07.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.05.2015 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
09.01.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.12.2014 |
First examination report |
|
15.10.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.07.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] |
03.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.02.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
28.02.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
28.02.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
21.02.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] |
21.02.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] |
04.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|