Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9750768 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2017 | B2 | US2014199274 | 17.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US38513 | 18.05.2012 | US201161488678 | 20.05.2011 | US201214118982 | 18.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6196213B | Global Dossier | 13.09.2017 | B2 | JP2014516528 | 17.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US38513 | 18.05.2012 | US201161488678 | 20.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2980209 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2018 | B1 | EP2980209 | 03.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161488678 | 20.05.2011 | EP12788730 | 18.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2836483 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2020 | C | CA2836483 | 29.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US38513 | 18.05.2012 | US201161488678 | 20.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2710124 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2016 | B1 | EP2710124 | 02.04.2014 | A4 | EP2710124 | 26.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US38513 | 18.05.2012 | US201161488678 | 20.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2710124T | 09.05.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US38513 | 18.05.2012 | US201161488678 | 20.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2980209T | 23.04.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161488678 | 20.05.2011 | EP12788730 | 18.05.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012162124 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161488678 | 20.05.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016198101 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161488678 | 20.05.2011 | Type | Divisional application | EP2980209 |