EP2710124 - NEURONAL PROGENITOR CELLS AND USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The McLean Hospital Corporation 115 Mill Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | [2016/26] |
Former [2014/13] | For all designated states The McLean Hospital Corporation 115 Mill Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | ||
For all designated states Kim, Kwang-Soo 27 Lillian Road Lexington, Massachusetts 02420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kwang-Soo 27 Lillian Road Lexington Massachusetts 02420 / US | 02 /
CHUNG, Sangmi 255 Worthen Rd E Lexington Massachusetts 02421 / US | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Crease, Devanand John Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2016/08] |
Former [2014/13] | Crease, Devanand John Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 12788730.5 | 18.05.2012 | [2016/08] | WO2012US38513 | Priority number, date | US201161488678P | 20.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161488678 P | [2014/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012162124 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2710124 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2710124 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 29.11.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0797, A61K35/30, A61K48/00, A61P25/28 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
A61K35/30 (EP,US);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07K16/2863 (EP,US);
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
C12N5/0623 (EP,US);
C12N2500/25 (EP,US);
C12N2501/115 (EP,US);
C12N2501/15 (EP,US);
C12N2501/235 (EP,US);
C12N2501/60 (EP,US);
C12N2506/02 (EP,US);
C12N2506/45 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEURONALE VORLÄUFERZELLEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2014/13] | English: | NEURONAL PROGENITOR CELLS AND USES | [2014/13] | French: | CELLULES PROGÉNITRICES NEURONALES ET UTILISATIONS | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2013 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 17.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15168050.1 / EP2980209 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.05.2012 | AL | 24.02.2016 | AT | 24.02.2016 | BE | 24.02.2016 | CY | 24.02.2016 | CZ | 24.02.2016 | EE | 24.02.2016 | ES | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | HR | 24.02.2016 | IS | 24.02.2016 | IT | 24.02.2016 | LT | 24.02.2016 | LV | 24.02.2016 | MC | 24.02.2016 | MK | 24.02.2016 | PL | 24.02.2016 | RO | 24.02.2016 | RS | 24.02.2016 | SI | 24.02.2016 | SK | 24.02.2016 | SM | 24.02.2016 | TR | 24.02.2016 | LU | 18.05.2016 | BG | 24.05.2016 | NO | 24.05.2016 | GR | 25.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | PT | 24.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.05.2012 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IS | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.05.2012 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.05.2012 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
ES | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0183715 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 1 * * the whole document * * figure 2 *; | [YP]WO2011130675 (MCLEAN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [YP] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2010096496 (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - CHUNG S ET AL, "Genetic selection of sox1GFP-expressing neural precursors removes residual tumorigenic pluripotent stem cells and attenuates tumor formation after transplantation", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, WILEY INTERSCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 97, no. 5, doi:10.1111/J.1471-4159.2006.03841.X, ISSN 0022-3042, (20060601), pages 1467 - 1480, (20060428), XP008143938 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1471-4159.2006.03841.x | [Y] - YAN YIPING ET AL, "Directed differentiation of dopaminergic neuronal subtypes from human embryonic stem cells", STEM CELLS, ALPHAMED PRESS, DAYTON, OH, US, (20050601), vol. 23, no. 6, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 781 - 790, XP009087442 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * page 784, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 785; figure 2 * | [Y] - GALE EMILY ET AL, "Midbrain dopaminergic neuron fate specification: Of mice and embryonic stem cells", MOLECULAR BRAIN, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON UK, (20080930), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1756-6606-1-8, ISSN 1756-6606, page 8, XP021045971 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1756-6606-1-8 | [XP] - S. CHUNG ET AL, "ES cell-derived renewable and functional midbrain dopaminergic progenitors", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20110607), vol. 108, no. 23, doi:10.1073/pnas.1016443108, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9703 - 9708, XP055101591 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1016443108 | International search | [A]EP1666590 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2007128168 (JORGENSEN JESPER R [DK], et al); | [A]RU2407790 (NOVARTIS FORSHUNGSSTIFTUNG TSVAJGNIDERLASSUNG FRIDRIKH MISHER INST FOR BIOMEDIKAL RISECH [CH]) | by applicant | WO0183715 | WO2011130675 | WO2010096496 | EP1666590 | EP0301777 | US4353888 | US4744933 | US4749620 | US4814274 | US5084350 | US5089272 | - YAN YIPING ET AL., STEM CELLS, (2005), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 781 - 790 | - GALE ET AL., MOLECULAR BRAIN, (2008), vol. 1, no. 1, page 8 | - TAKAHASHI ET AL., CELL, (2006), vol. 126, pages 663 - 676 | - CELL, (2007), vol. 131, pages 861 - 872 | - NAKAGAWA ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2008), vol. 26, pages 101 - 106 | - TAKAHASHI ET AL., CELL, (2007), vol. 131, pages 861 - 872 | - BJORKLUND ET AL., Neural Grafting in the Mammalian CNS, ELSEVIER, (1985), pages 169 - 178 | - LEKSELL ET AL., ACTA NEUROCHIR., (1980), vol. 52, pages 1 - 7 | - LEKSELL ET AL., J. NEUROSURG., (1987), vol. 66, pages 626 - 629 | - LEKSELL ET AL., J. NEUROL. NEUROSURG. PSYCHIATRY, (1985), vol. 48, pages 14 - 18 | - MADRAZO ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (1987), vol. 316, pages 831 - 834 | - PENN ET AL., NEUROSURGERY, (1988), vol. 22, pages 999 - 1004 | - KENNEDY, BRAIN, (1997), vol. 120, pages 1245 - 1259 | - WOLFF ET AL., HUMAN MOL. GENET., (1992), vol. 1, pages 363 - 369 | - WOLFF ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1465 - 1468 | - ZHU ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, pages 209 - 211 | - NABEL ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1342 - 1344 | - PRZYBYLSKA ET AL., J. GENE MED., (2004), vol. 6, pages 85 - 92 | - SVAHN ET AL., J. GENE MED., (2004), vol. 6, pages S36 - S44 | - AGID, Y., "Parkinson's disease: pathophysiology", LANCET, (1991), vol. 337, pages 1321 - 1324 | - ANDERSSON, E.R.; PRAKASH, N.; CAJANEK, L.; MININA, E.; BRYJA, V.; BRYJOVA, L.; YAMAGUCHI, T.P.; HALL, A.C.; WURST, W.; ARENAS, E., "Wnt5a regulates ventral midbrain morphogenesis and the development of A9-A10 dopaminergic cells in vivo", PLOS ONE, (2008), vol. 3, page E3517 | - BJ6RKLUND, L.; SANCHEZ-PERNAUTE, R.; CHUNG, S.; ANDERSSON, T.; CHEN, I.; MCNAUGHT, K.; BROWNELL, A.; JENKINS, B.; WAHLESTEDT, C.;, "Embryonic stem cells develop into functional dopaminergic neurons after transplantation in a Parkinson rat model", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 2344 - 2349 | - CARLSSON, A.; LINDQVIST, M.; MAGNUSSON, T., "3,4-Dihydroxyphenylalanine and 5-hydroxytryptophan as reserpine antagonists", NATURE, (1957), vol. 180, page 1200 | - CASTELO-BRANCO, G.; SOUSA, K.M.; BRYJA, V.; PINTO, L.; WAGNER, J.; ARENAS, E., "Ventral midbrain glia express region-specific transcription factors and regulate dopaminergic neurogenesis through Wnt-5a secretion", MOL CELL NEUROSCI, (2006), vol. 31, pages 251 - 262 | - CASTELO-BRANCO, G.; WAGNER, J.; RODRIGUEZ, F.J.; KELE, J.; SOUSA, K.; RAWAL, N.; PASOLLI, H.A.; FUCHS, E.; KITAJEWSKI, J.; ARENAS,, "Differential regulation of midbrain dopaminergic neuron development by Wnt-1, Wnt-3a, and Wnt-5a", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2003), vol. 100, pages 12747 - 12752 | - CHUNG, S.; SONNTAG, K.C.; ANDERSSON, T.; BJORKLUND, L.M.; PARK, J.J.; KIM, D.W.; KANG, U.J.; ISACSON, O.; KIM, K.S., "Genetic engineering of mouse embryonic stem cells by Nurrl enhances differentiation and maturation into dopaminergic neurons", EUR J NEUROSCI, (2002), vol. 16, pages 1829 - 1838 | - CHUNG, S.; HEDLUND, E.; HWANG, M.; KIM, D.W.; SHIN, B.S.; HWANG, D.Y.; JUNG KANG, U.; ISACSON, O.; KIM, K.S., "The homeodomain transcription factor Pitx3 facilitates differentiation of mouse embryonic stem cells into AHD2-expressing dopaminergic neurons", MOL CELL NEUROSCI, (2005), vol. 28, pages 241 - 252 | - CHUNG, S.; SHIN, B.S.; HEDLUND, E.; PRUSZAK, J.; FERREE, A.; KANG, U.J.; ISACSON, 0.; KIM, KS., "Genetic selection of soxl GFP-expressing neural precursors removes residual tumorigenic pluripotent stem cells and attenuates tumor formation after transplantation", J NEUROCHEM, (2006), vol. 97, pages 1467 - 1480 | - CHUNG, S.; SHIN, B.S.; HWANG, M.; LARDARO, T.; KANG, U.J.; ISACSON, O.; KIM, K.S., "Neural precursors derived from embryonic stem cells, but not those from fetal ventral mesencephalon, maintain the potential to differentiate into dopaminergic neurons after expansion in vitro", STEM CELLS, (2006), vol. 24, pages 1583 - 1593 | - CHUNG, S.; LEUNG, A.; HAN, B.S.; CHANG, M.Y.; MOON, J.I.; KIM, C.H.; HONG, S.; PRUSZAK, J.; ISACSON, 0.; KIM, K.S., "Wntl-lmxla forms a novel autoregulatory loop and controls midbrain dopaminergic differentiation synergistically with the SHH-FoxA2 pathway", CELL STEM CELL, (2009), vol. 5, pages 646 - 658 | - ELKABETZ, Y.; PANAGIOTAKOS, G.; AL SHAMY, G.; SOCCI, N.D.; TABAR, V.; STUDER, L., "Human ES cell-derived neural rosettes reveal a functionally distinct early neural stem cell stage", GENES DEV, (2008), vol. 22, pages 152 - 165 | - ERIKSEN, J.; RASMUSSEN, S.G.; RASMUSSEN, T.N.; VAEGTER, C.B.; CHA, J.H.; ZOU, M.F.; NEWMAN, A.H.; GETHER, U., "Visualization of dopamine transporter trafficking in live neurons by use of fluorescent cocaine analogs", J NEUROSCI, (2009), vol. 29, pages 6794 - 6808 | - FASANO, C.A.; CHAMBERS, S.M.; LEE, G.; TOMISHIMA, M.J.; STUDER, L., "Efficient derivation of functional floor plate tissue from human embryonic stem cells", CELL STEM CELL, (2010), vol. 6, pages 336 - 347 | - HEBSGAARD, J.B.; NELANDER, J.; SABELSTROM, H.; JONSSON, M.E.; STOTT, S.; PARMAR, M., "Dopamine neuron precursors within the developing human mesencephalon show radial glial characteristics", GLIA, (2009), vol. 57, pages 1648 - 1658 | - HEDLUND, E.; PRUSZAK, J.; LARDARO, T.; LUDWIG, W.; VINUELA, A.; KIM, K.S.; ISACSON, O., "Embryonic stem cell-derived Pitx3-enhanced green fluorescent protein midbrain dopamine neurons survive enrichment by fluorescence-activated cell sorting and function in an animal model of Parkinson's disease", STEM CELLS, (2008), vol. 26, pages 1526 - 1536 | - HEMRE, K.M.; KELLER-PECK, C.R.; CAMPBELL, R.M.; PETERSON, A.C.; MULLEN, R.J.; GOLDOWITZ, D., "Annexin IV is a marker of roof and floor plate development in the murine CNS", J COMP NEUROL, (1996), vol. 368, pages 527 - 537 | - HOCKEMEYER D; SOLDNER F; BEARD C; GAO Q; MITALIPOVA M; DEKELVER RC; KATIBAH GE; AMORA R; BOYDSTON EA; ZEITLER B, "Efficient targeting of expressed and silent genes in human ESCs and iPSCs using zinc-finger nucleases", NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2009), vol. 27, no. 9, pages 851 - 857 | - HONG, S.; HWANG, D.Y.; YOON, S.; ISACSON, O.; RAMEZANI, A.; HAWLEY, R.G; KIM, K.S., "Functional analysis of various promoters in lentiviral vectors at different stages of in vitro differentiation of mouse embryonic stem cells", MOL THE, (2007), vol. 15, pages 1630 - 1639 | - HONG, S.; KANG, U.J.; ISACSON, 0; KIM, K.S., "Neural precursors derived from human embryonic stem cells maintain long-term proliferation without losing the potential to differentiate into all three neural lineages, including dopaminergic neurons", J NEUROCHEM, (2008), vol. 104, pages 316 - 324 | - HWANG, D.Y.; ARDAYFIO, P.; KANG, U.J.; SEMINA, E.V; KIM, K.S., "Selective loss of dopaminergic neurons in the substantia nigra of Pitx3-deficient aphakia mice", BRAIN RES MOL BRAIN RES, (2003), vol. 114, pages 123 - 131 | - HWANG, D.Y.; FLEMING, S.M.; ARDAYFIO, P.; MORAN-GATES, T.; KIM, H.; TARAZI, F.I.; CHESSELET, M.F; KIM, K.S., "3,4-dihydroxyphenylalanine reverses the motor deficits in Pitx3-deficient aphakia mice: behavioral characterization of a novel genetic model of Parkinson's disease", JNEUROSCI, (2005), vol. 25, pages 2132 - 2137 | - JOHE, K.K.; HAZEL, T.G; MULLER, T; DUGICH-DJORDJEVIC, M.M.; MCKAY, R.D, "Single factors direct the differentiation of stem cells from the fetal and adult central nervous system", GENES DEV, (1996), vol. 10, pages 3129 - 3140 | - KAWASAKI, H.; MIZUSEKI, K.; NISHIKAWA, S.; KANEKO, S.; KUWANA, Y.; NAKANISHI, S.; NISHIKAWA, S.I.; SASAI, Y., "Induction of midbrain dopaminergic neurons from ES cells by stromal cell-derived inducing activity", NEURON, (2000), vol. 28, pages 31 - 40 | - KIM, J.H.; AUERBACH, J.M.; RODRIGUEZ-GOMEZ, J.A.; VELASCO, I.; GAVIN, D.; LUMELSKY, N.; LEE, S.H.; NGUYEN, J.; SANCHEZ-PERNAUTE, R, "Dopamine neurons derived from embryonic stem cells function in an animal model of Parkinson's disease", NATURE, (2002), vol. 418, pages 50 - 56 | - KITAJIMA, K.; KOSHIMIZU, U.; NAKAMURA, T., "Expression of a novel type of classic cadherin, PB-cadherin in developing brain and limb buds", DEV DYN, (1999), vol. 215, pages 206 - 214 | - KITTAPPA, R.; CHANG, W.W.; AWATRAMANI, R.B.; MCKAY, R.D., "The foxa2 gene controls the birth and spontaneous degeneration of dopamine neurons in old age", PLOS BIOL, (2007), vol. 5, page E325 | - KORDOWER, J.H.; BRUNDIN, P., "Lewy body pathology in long-term fetal nigral transplants: is Parkinson's disease transmitted from one neural system to another?", NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (2009), vol. 34, page 254 | - KORDOWER, J.H.; CHU, Y.; HAUSER, R.A.; FREEMAN, T.B.; OLANOW, C.W., "Lewy body-like pathology in longterm embryonic nigral transplants in Parkinson's disease", NAT MED, (2008), vol. 14, pages 504 - 506 | - LEE, S.H.; LUMELSKY, N.; STUDER, L.; AUERBACH, J.M.; MCKAY, R.D., "Efficient generation of midbrain and hindbrain neurons from mouse embryonic stem cells", NAT BIOTECH, (2000), vol. 18, pages 675 - 679 | - LI, J.Y.; CHRISTOPHERSEN, N.S.; HALL, V.; SOULET, D.; BRUNDIN, P., "Critical issues of clinical human embryonic stem cell therapy for brain repair", TRENDS NEUROSCI, (2008), vol. 31, pages 146 - 153 | - LI, J.Y.; ENGLUND, E.; HOLTON, J.L.; SOULET, D.; HAGELL, P.; LEES, A.J.; LASHLEY, T.; QUINN, N.P.; REHNCRONA, S.; BJORKLUND, A. ET, "Lewy bodies in grafted neurons in subjects with Parkinson's disease suggest host-to-graft disease propagation", NAT MED, (2008), vol. 14, pages 501 - 503 | - LINDVALL, O.; BJORKLUND, A., "Cell therapy in Parkinson's disease", NEURORX, (2004), vol. 1, pages 382 - 393 | - LINDVALL, O.; KOKAIA, Z., "Prospects of stem cell therapy for replacing dopamine neurons in Parkinson's disease", TRENDS PHARMACOL SCI, (2009), vol. 30, pages 260 - 267 | - MENDEZ, I.; VINUELA, A.; ASTRADSSON, A.; MUKHIDA, K.; HALLETT, P.; ROBERTSON, H.; TIERNEY, T.; HOLNESS, R.; DAGHER, A.; TROJANOWSK, "Dopamine neurons implanted into people with Parkinson's disease survive without pathology for 14 years", NAT MED, (2008), vol. 14, pages 507 - 509 | - NELANDER, J.; HEBSGAARD, J.B.; PARMAR, M., "Organization of the human embryonic ventral mesencephalon", GENE EXPR PATTERNS, (2009), vol. 9, pages 555 - 561 | - OH, M.S.; HONG, S.J.; HUH, Y.; KIM, K.S., "Expression of transgenes in midbrain dopamine neurons using the tyrosine hydroxylase promoter", GENE THER, (2009), vol. 16, pages 437 - 440 | - ONO, Y.; NAKATANI, T.; SAKAMOTO, Y.; MIZUHARA, E.; MINAKI, Y.; KUMAI, M.; HAMAGUCHI, A.; NISHIMURA, M.; INOUE, Y.; HAYASHI, H. ET, "Differences in neurogenic potential in floor plate cells along an anteroposterior location: midbrain dopaminergic neurons originate from mesencephalic floor plate cells", DEVELOPMENT, (2007), vol. 134, pages 3213 - 3225 | - PANCHISION, D.M.; CHEN, H.L.; PISTOLLATO, F.; PAPINI, D.; NI, H.T.; HAWLEY, T.S., "Optimized flow cytometric analysis of central nervous system tissue reveals novel functional relationships among cells expressing CD133, CD15, and CD24", STEM CELLS, (2007), vol. 25, pages 1560 - 1570 | - PARISH, C.L.; CASTELO-BRANCO, G.; RAWAL, N.; TONNESEN, J.; SORENSEN, A.T.; SALTO, C.; KOKAIA, M.; LINDVALL, O.; ARENAS, E., "Wnt5a-treated midbrain neural stem cells improve dopamine cell replacement therapy in parkinsonian mice", J CLIN INVEST, (2008), vol. 118, pages 149 - 160 | - PARK CH; MINN YK; LEE JY; CHOI DH; CHANG MY; SHIM JW; KO JY; KOH HC; KANG MJ; KANG JS, "In vitro and in vivo analyses of human embryonic stem cell-derived dopamine neurons", J NEUROCHEM, (200503), vol. 92, no. 5, pages 1265 - 76 | - PERRIER, A.L.; TABAR, V.; BARBERI, T.; RUBIO, M.E.; BRUSES, J.; TOPF, N.; HARRISON, N.L.; STUDER, L., "Derivation of midbrain dopamine neurons from human embryonic stem cells", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2004), vol. 101, pages 12543 - 12548 | - POLITIS, M.; WU, K.; LOANE, C.; QUINN, N.P.; BROOKS, D.J.; REHNCRONA, S.; BJORKLUND, A.; LINDVALL, O.; PICCINI, P., "Serotonergic neurons mediate dyskinesia side effects in Parkinson's patients with neural transplants", SCI TRANSL MED, (2010), vol. 2, page 38RA46 | - REZGAOUI, M.; HERMEY, G.; RIEDEL, I.B.; HAMPE, W.; SCHALLER, H.C.; HERMANS-BORGMEYER, I., "Identification of SorCS2, a novel member of the VPS 10 domain containing receptor family, prominently expressed in the developing mouse brain", MECH DEV, (2001), vol. 100, pages 335 - 338 | - ROY, N.S.; CLEREN, C.; SINGH, S.K.; YANG, L.; BEAL, M.F.; GOLDMAN, S.A., "Functional engraftment of human ES cell-derived dopaminergic neurons enriched by coculture with telomerase-immortalized midbrain astrocytes", NAT MED, (2006), vol. 12, pages 1259 - 1268 | - SANCHEZ-PERNAUTE, R.; LEE, H.; PATTERSON, M.; RESKE-NIELSEN, C.; YOSHIZAKI, T.; SONNTAG, K.C.; STUDER, L.; ISACSON, O., "Parthenogenetic dopamine neurons from primate embryonic stem cells restore function in experimental Parkinson's disease", BRAIN, (2008), vol. 131, pages 2127 - 2139 | - SCHULTE, G.; BRYJA, V.; RAWAL, N.; CASTELO-BRANCO, G.; SOUSA, K.M.; ARENAS, E., "Purified Wnt-5a increases differentiation of midbrain dopaminergic cells and dishevelled phosphorylation", J NEUROCHEM, (2005), vol. 92, pages 1550 - 1553 | - SCHULZ, T.C.; NOGGLE, S.A.; PALMARINI, G.M.; WEILER, D.A.; LYONS, I.G.; PENSA, K.A.; MEEDENIYA, A.C.; DAVIDSON, B.P.; LAMBERT, N.A, "Differentiation of human embryonic stem cells to dopaminergic neurons in serum-free suspension culture", STEM CELLS, (2004), vol. 22, pages 1218 - 1238 | - SHEN, Q.; GODERIE, S.K.; JIN, L.; KARANTH, N.; SUN, Y.; ABRAMOVA, N.; VINCENT, P.; PUMIGLIA, K.; TEMPLE, S., "Endothelial cells stimulate self-renewal and expand neurogenesis of neural stem cells", SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 304, pages 1338 - 1340 | - SUMMERHURST, K.; STARK, M.; SHARPE, J.; DAVIDSON, D.; MURPHY, P., "3D representation of Wnt and Frizzled gene expression patterns in the mouse embryo at embryonic day 11.5 (Tsl9", GENE EXPR PATTERNS, (2008), vol. 8, pages 331 - 348 | - SVENDSEN, C., "Stem cells and Parkinson's disease: toward a treatment, not a cure", CELL STEM CELL, (2008), vol. 2, pages 412 - 413 | - TAKAHASHI, K.; YAMANAKA, S., "Induction of pluripotent stem cells from mouse embryonic and adult fibroblast cultures by defined factors", CELL, (2006), vol. 126, pages 663 - 676 | - WERNIG, M.; ZHAO, J.P.; PRUSZAK, J.; HEDLUND, E.; FU, D.; SOLDNER, F.; BROCCOLI, V.; CONSTANTINE-PATON, M.; ISACSON, 0.; JAENISCH,, "Neurons derived from reprogrammed fibroblasts functionally integrate into the fetal brain and improve symptoms of rats with Parkinson's disease", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2008), vol. 105, pages 5856 - 5861 | - YE, W.; SHIMAMURA, K.; RUBENSTEIN, J.L.; HYNES, M.A.; ROSENTHAL, A., "FGF and Shh signals control dopaminergic and serotonergic cell fate in the anterior neural plate", CELL, (1998), vol. 93, pages 755 - 766 | - ZENG, X.; CAI, J.; CHEN, J.; LUO, Y.; YOU, Z.B.; FOTTER, E.; WANG, Y.; HARVEY, B.; MIURA, T.; BACKMAN, C. ET AL., "Dopaminergic differentiation of human embryonic stem cells", STEM CELLS, (2004), vol. 22, pages 925 - 940 | - ZHU, Q.; RUNKO, E.; IMONDI, R.; MILLIGAN, T.; KAPITULA, D.; KAPRIELIAN, Z., "New cell surface marker of the rat floor plate and notochord", DEV DYN, (1998), vol. 211, pages 314 - 326 | - ZISMAN, S.; MAROM, K.; AVRAHAM, 0.; RINSKY-HALIVNI, L.; GAI, U.; KLIGUN, G.; TZARFATY-MAJAR, V.; SUZUKI, T.; KLAR, A., "Proteolysis and membrane capture of F-spondin generates combinatorial guidance cues from a single molecule", J CELL BIOL, (2007), vol. 178, pages 1237 - 1249 |