EP2719210 - ANONYMOUS LOCATION-BASED NOTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAHIANI, Limor Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
GEVA, Yair E. Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
BEN-ISRAEL, Elad Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12796071.4 | 03.06.2012 | WO2012US40631 | Priority number, date | US201113157334 | 10.06.2011 Original published format: US201113157334 | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012170314 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2719210 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.02.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/02, H04W4/12, H04W4/02, H04L29/06, H04L12/58 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04L51/222 (EP,US);
H04L63/0421 (EP,US);
H04W4/021 (EP,US);
H04L67/55 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/16] | H04W12/02, H04W4/12, H04W4/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Title | German: | ANONYME STANDORTABHÄNGIGE BENACHRICHTIGUNG | [2014/16] | English: | ANONYMOUS LOCATION-BASED NOTIFICATION | [2014/16] | French: | NOTIFICATION BASÉE SUR UN EMPLACEMENT ANONYME | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 04.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1914677 (ERTEMEL ADNAN VEYSEL [TR]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0039]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2009003346 (KRAMER DOUGLAS C [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] *; | [X]US2009055485 (TSAI TU-HSIN [TW], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0038]; figure 2B * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0044]; figure 3A * * paragraph [0048]; figure 3B * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] * | International search | [A]US2009003346 (KRAMER DOUGLAS C [US], et al); | [A]US2009047937 (ZELLNER SAMUEL N [US], et al); | [A]US2009055485 (TSAI TU-HSIN [TW], et al); | [A]WO2010011807 (TELE ATLAS NORTH AMERICA INC [US], et al) |