EP2794980 - DETERGENT SOLUTION PUMP-OUT SECTION FOR A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE FOR THE CARE OF LAUNDRY ITEMS, AND CORRESPONDING DOMESTIC APPLIANCE HAVING A DETERGENT SOLUTION PUMP-OUT SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AYHANER, Alper. Kornerstr. 47 2157 Berlin / DE | 02 /
BOLDUAN, Edwin. Strasse E3 13629 Berlin / DE | 03 /
RICHTER, Kurt. Rosa-Luxemburg-Platz Nr.8 14612 Falkensee / DE | [2014/44] | Application number, filing date | 12809747.4 | 17.12.2012 | [2015/47] | WO2012EP75799 | Priority number, date | DE20111089625 | 22.12.2011 Original published format: DE102011089625 | [2014/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013092494 | Date: | 27.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2794980 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2794980 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/08, D06F39/12 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
D06F39/083 (EP,CN,US);
D06F39/12 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAUGENABPUMPSTRANG FÜR EIN HAUSHALTSGERÄT ZUR PFLEGE VON WÄSCHESTÜCKEN SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDES HAUSHALTSGERÄT MIT EINEM LAUGENABPUMPSTRANG | [2014/44] | English: | DETERGENT SOLUTION PUMP-OUT SECTION FOR A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE FOR THE CARE OF LAUNDRY ITEMS, AND CORRESPONDING DOMESTIC APPLIANCE HAVING A DETERGENT SOLUTION PUMP-OUT SECTION | [2014/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉVACUATION D'EAU DE LAVAGE POUR UN APPAREIL MÉNAGER DESTINÉ À L'ENTRETIEN DU LINGE ET APPAREIL MÉNAGER CORRESPONDANT ÉQUIPÉ D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2014/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 23.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2012 | AL | 18.11.2015 | BG | 18.11.2015 | CY | 18.11.2015 | CZ | 18.11.2015 | DK | 18.11.2015 | EE | 18.11.2015 | ES | 18.11.2015 | FI | 18.11.2015 | HR | 18.11.2015 | LT | 18.11.2015 | LV | 18.11.2015 | MC | 18.11.2015 | MK | 18.11.2015 | MT | 18.11.2015 | NL | 18.11.2015 | RO | 18.11.2015 | RS | 18.11.2015 | SE | 18.11.2015 | SI | 18.11.2015 | SK | 18.11.2015 | SM | 18.11.2015 | IE | 17.12.2015 | LU | 17.12.2015 | BE | 31.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | FR | 18.01.2016 | NO | 18.02.2016 | GR | 19.02.2016 | IS | 18.03.2016 | PT | 18.03.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.12.2012 | |
BG | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
MT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 18.01.2016 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 17.12.2012 | |
BG | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
LU | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 18.01.2016 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 17.12.2012 | |
BG | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 18.01.2016 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 18.01.2016 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
IE | 17.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [ID]DE102006031861 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [ID] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] - [0011] - [0016] , [0026] - [0031]; figure -; claim - *; | [AD]DE102006011735 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [AD] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0020] - [0031]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP2128326 (BONFERRARO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] - [0012]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1350884 (BSH BALAY SA [ES]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0017] - [0026]; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | DE102006031861 | DE102006011735 |