EP2768980 - COMPOSITE BIOMARKERS FOR NON-INVASIVE SCREENING, DIAGNOSIS AND PROGNOSIS OF COLORECTAL CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states King Abdullah University of Science and Technology 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | [2018/22] |
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states King Abdullah University of Science and Technology 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANSOUR, Hicham 3 bis Rue Khan Younes Cite Quods Oujda 60000 / MA | 02 /
INCITTI, Roberto 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | 03 /
BAJIC, Vladimir 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | [2018/22] |
Former [2014/35] | 01 /
MANSOUR, Hicham 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | ||
02 /
INCITTI, Roberto 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | |||
03 /
BAJIC, Vladimir 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | Representative(s) | Feray, Valérie Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2018/22] |
Former [2014/35] | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12813096.0 | 16.10.2012 | [2018/22] | WO2012IB02515 | Priority number, date | US201161548202P | 17.10.2011 Original published format: US 201161548202 P | [2014/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013057581 | Date: | 25.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2768980 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2768980 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6886 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (US);
C12Q2600/154 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/35] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDBIOMARKER FÜR NICHTINVASIVES SCREENING, DIAGNOSE UND PROGNOSE VON KOLOREKTALKARZINOM | [2014/35] | English: | COMPOSITE BIOMARKERS FOR NON-INVASIVE SCREENING, DIAGNOSIS AND PROGNOSIS OF COLORECTAL CANCER | [2014/35] | French: | BIOMARQUEURS COMPOSITES POUR CRIBLAGE, DIAGNOSTIC ET PRONOSTIC NON INVASIFS DE CANCER COLORECTAL | [2014/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2016/09] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.10.2012 | AL | 30.05.2018 | AT | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | ES | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | IT | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | MK | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PL | 30.05.2018 | PT | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | RS | 30.05.2018 | SE | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | SM | 30.05.2018 | TR | 30.05.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | NO | 30.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | IE | 16.10.2018 | LU | 16.10.2018 | MT | 16.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 16.10.2012 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MK | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
MT | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 16.10.2012 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
MT | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
MT | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
MT | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
MT | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO03072821 (EPIGENOMICS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-31,36-43 * page 7, paragraph 2; figures 1-3; claims 1-31 * * page 20, paragraph 3; figure 4; table 6 *; | [Y]WO2005001140 (EPIGENOMICS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-31,36-43 * claim 5 * * the whole document *; | [Y] - MUHAMMAD G KIBRIYA ET AL, "A genome-wide DNA methylation study in colorectal carcinoma", BMC MEDICAL GENOMICS, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON UK, (20110623), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1755-8794-4-50, ISSN 1755-8794, page 50, XP021104259 [Y] 1-31,36-43 * the whole document * * page 10, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 11; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1755-8794-4-50 | [Y] - XIAO-LI XU ET AL, "Methylation profile of the promoter CpG islands of 31 genes that may contribute to colorectal carcinogenesis", WORLD J GASTROENTEROL, (20040101), vol. 10, no. 23, pages 3441 - 3454, XP055056012 [Y] 1-31,36-43 * the whole document * * page 3447, column 2 * * page 3453, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3748/wjg.v10.i23.3441 | [Y] - CHENG YU-WEI ET AL, "Multiplexed profiling of candidate genes for CpG island methylation status using a flexible PCR/LDR/Universal Array assay", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, WOODBURY, NY, US, (20060201), vol. 16, no. 2, doi:10.1101/GR.4181406, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 282 - 289, XP002522613 [Y] 1-31,36-43 * the whole document * * page 286 - page 287 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.4181406 | [Y] - ATSUSHI ISHIGURO ET AL, "Influence of methylated p15 INK4b and p16 INK4a genes on clinicopathological features in colorectal cancer", JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY AND HEPATOLOGY, (20060801), vol. 21, no. 8, doi:10.1111/j.1440-1746.2006.04137.x, ISSN 0815-9319, pages 1334 - 1339, XP055055862 [Y] 1-31,36-43 * the whole document * * page 1338 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1440-1746.2006.04137.x | [X] - Illumina, "Whole-genome expression analysis using the Sentrix Human-6 and HumanRef-8 expression beadchips", (20050628), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://www.illumina.com/Documents/products/techbulletins/techbulletin_whole_genome_expression.pdf, (20110819), XP055005291 [X] 32-35 * the whole document * | [X] - AFFYMETRIX, "GeneChip TM Human Genome U133 Arrays", DATASHEET AFFYMETRIX,, (20030101), pages 1 - 8, XP007921348 [X] 32-35 * the whole document * | [X] - AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES, "Agilent SurePrint G3 Human Catalog CGH Microarrays", INTERNET CITATION, (20090108), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://www.chem.agilent.com/Library/brochures/5990-3368en_lo.pdf, (20110926), XP002660065 [X] 32-35 * the whole document * | [A] - ILLUMINA, "Infinium HumanMethylation27, RevB BeadChip Kits", INTERNET CITATION, (20110208), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.illumina.com/products/infinium_humanmethylation27_beadchip_kits.ilmn, (20110208), XP002621307 [A] 32-35 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2007140319 | WO2008102002 | - YOUNG-HO KIM ET AL, "Epigenomic Analysis of Aberrantly Methylated Genes in Colorectal Cancer Identifies Genes Commonly Affected by Epigenetic Alterations", ANNALS OF SURGICAL ONCOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20110205), vol. 18, no. 8, doi:10.1245/S10434-011-1573-Y, ISSN 1534-4681, pages 2338 - 2347, XP019926925 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1245/s10434-011-1573-y | - MORI ET AL, "A Genome-Wide Search Identifies Epigenetic Silencing of Somatostatin, Tachykinin-1, and 5 Other Genes in Colon Cancer", GASTROENTEROLOGY, ELSEVIER, PHILADELPHIA, PA, (20060901), vol. 131, no. 3, doi:10.1053/J.GASTRO.2006.06.006, ISSN 0016-5085, pages 797 - 808, XP005659138 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2006.06.006 | - BODIL ØSTER ET AL, "Identification and validation of highly frequent CpG island hypermethylation in colorectal adenomas and carcinomas", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, (20110311), vol. 129, no. 12, doi:10.1002/ijc.25951, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 2855 - 2866, XP055230551 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.25951 | - GURO E LIND ET AL, "Identification of an epigenetic biomarker panel with high sensitivity and specificity for colorectal cancer and adenomas", MOLECULAR CANCER, GB, (20110101), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1186/gb-2008-9-9-r139, ISSN 1476-4598, page 85, XP055230547 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1476-4598-10-85 | - SHUHO SEMBA ET AL, "Down-Regulation of PIK3CG, a Catalytic Subunit of Phosphatidylinositol 3-OH Kinase, by CpG Hypermethylation in Human Colorectal Carcinoma", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (20021201), vol. 8, pages 3824 - 3831, XP055231234 | by applicant | US4458066 | - GREEN ET AL., CHEM. BIOL., (1995), vol. 2, pages 683 - 695 | - PAGRATIS ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 15, pages 68 - 73 | - NOLTE ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 1116 - 1119 | - KLOBMANN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 1112 - 1115 | - EATON; PIEKERN, ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 64, pages 837 - 863 | - REED ET AL., CANCER RES., (1990), vol. 50, pages 6565 - 6570 | - TAM ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 977 - 986 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (200909), vol. 27, no. 9, pages 858 - 863 | - FROMMER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 1827 - 1831 | - NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1996), vol. 24, pages 5058 - 5059 | - XIONG; LAIRD, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 2532 - 2534 | - EADS ET AL., CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, pages 2302 - 2306 | - GONZALGO; JONES, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 2529 - 2531 | - TOYOTA ET AL., CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, pages 2307 - 12 | - NATURE BIOTECNOL, (200909), vol. 27, no. 9, pages 858 - 863 | - BEAUCAGE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1981), vol. 22, pages 1859 - 1862 | - MANIATIS ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR, (1982), vol. 281, page 280 | - CSH-QUANTITATIVE BIOLOGY, (1978), vol. 43, page 63 | - C. RADDING, ANN. REV. GENETICS, (1982), vol. 16, pages 405 - 437 | - SAIKI ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1985), vol. 3, pages 1008 - 1012 | - CONNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, page 278 | - LANDEGREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, page 1077 | - LANDEGREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 229 - 237 | - BEAUCAGE, S.L.; CARUTHERS M.H., "Deoxynucleoside phosphoramidites-A new class of key intermediates for deoxypolynucleotide synthesis", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1981), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(01)90461-7, pages 1859 - 1862, XP002007271 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)90461-7 | - CONNER BJ ET AL., "Detection of sickle cell beta S-globin allele by hybridization with synthetic oligonucleotides", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (198301), vol. ;80, no. 1, pages 278 - 82 | - DALLOL, A. ET AL., "SLIT2 Axon Guidance Molecule is Frequently Inactivatedi n Colorectal Cancer and Suppresses Growth of Colorectal Carcinoma Cells", CANCER RES, (2003), vol. 63, pages 1054 - 1058 | - EADS, C.A. ET AL., "CpG island hypermethylation in human colorectal tumors is not associated with DNA methyltransferase overexpression", CANCER RES, (1999), vol. 59, pages 2302 - 2306, XP002170143 | - FROMMER, M. ET AL., "A genomic sequencing protocol that yields a positive display of 5-methylcytosine residues in individual DNA strands", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.89.5.1827, pages 1827 - 1831, XP002941272 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.5.1827 | - GOEL, A. ET AL., "Epigenetic Inactivation of RUNX3 in Microsatellite Unstable Sporadic Colon Cancers", INT. J. CANCER, (2004), vol. 112, pages 754 - 759 | - GONZALGO, M.L.; JONES, P.A., "Rapid quantitation of methylation differences at specific sites using methylation-sensitive single nucleotide primer extension", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/25.12.2529, pages 2529 - 2531, XP002910404 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/25.12.2529 | - GREEN ET AL., "Nuclease-resistant nucleic acid ligands to vascular permeability factor/vascular endothelial growth factor", CHEM. BIOL., (1995), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/1074-5521(95)90032-2, pages 683 - 695, XP001084803 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1074-5521(95)90032-2 | - HERMAN, J.G. ET AL., "Methylation-specific PCR: a Novel PCR Assay for Methylation Status of CpG Islands", PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI, vol. 93, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.93.18.9821, pages 9821 - 6, XP002542477 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.18.9821 | - ISHIGURO, A. ET AL., INFLUENCE OF METHYLATED P15 AND P16 GENES ON CLINICOPATHOLOGICAL FEATURES IN COLORECTAL CANCER, (2006), vol. 21, no. 8, pages 1334 - 9 | - KIM, Y.-H. ET AL., "Epigenomic Analysis of Aberrantly Methylated Genes in Colorectal Cancer Identifies Genes Commonly Affected by Epigenetic Alterations", ANN SURG ONCOL, (2011), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1245/s10434-011-1573-y, pages 2338 - 2347, XP019926925 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1245/s10434-011-1573-y | - KUHN B; ABDEL-MONEM M; HOFFMANN-BERLING H; DNA HELICASES., COLD SPRING HARB SYMP QUANT BIOL., (1979), pages 63 - 7 | - LANDEGREN, U. ET AL., "A ligase-mediated gene detection technique", SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, doi:doi:10.1126/science.3413476, page 1077, XP000676556 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.3413476 | - LANDEGREN, U. ET AL., "DNA Diagnostics--Molecular Techniques and Automation", SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, doi:doi:10.1126/science.3051381, pages 229 - 237, XP002016560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.3051381 | - MANIATIS, T. ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR, (1982), vol. 281, page 280 | - NOLTE ET AL., "Mirror-design of L-oligonucleotide ligands binding to L-arginine", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0996-1116, pages 1116 - 1119, XP002039162 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0996-1116 | - PAGRATIS ET AL., "Potent 2'-amino-, and 2'-fluoro-2'-deoxyribonucleotide RNA inhibitors of keratinocyte growth factor", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0197-68, pages 68 - 73, XP002134081 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0197-68 | - PIEKERN, ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 64, pages 837 - 863 | - RADDING, C., "Homologous pairing and strand exchange in genetic recombination", ANN. REV. GENETICS, (1982), vol. 16, pages 405 - 437 | - SADRI, R.; HORNSBY, P.J, "Rapid analysis of DNA methylation using new restriction enzyme sites created by bisulfite modification", NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1996), vol. 24, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/24.24.5058, pages 5058 - 5059, XP002192857 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/24.24.5058 | - SAIKI, R.K. ET AL., "A Novel Method for the Detection of Polymorphic Restriction Sites by Cleavage of Oligonucleotide Probes: Application to Sickle-Cell Anemia", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1985), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt1185-1008, pages 1008 - 1012, XP009009348 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1185-1008 | - TOYOTA, M. ET AL., "Identification of differentially methylated sequences in colorectal cancer by methylated CpG island amplification", CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 59, pages 2307 - 12 | - XIONG, Z.; LAIRD, P.W., "COBRA: a sensitive and quantitative DNA methylation assay", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/25.12.2532, pages 2532 - 2534, XP002532716 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/25.12.2532 |