Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014353223 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011290235 | 29.12.2011 | WO2012JP08457 | 28.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013150975 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2013 | A | JP5229423B | 03.07.2013 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012286874 | 28.12.2012 | JP2011290235 | 29.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104010974B | Global Dossier | 21.09.2016 | B | CN104010974 | 27.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011290235 | 29.12.2011 | WO2012JP08457 | 28.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012359751B | Global Dossier | 02.07.2015 | B2 | AU2012359751 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011290235 | 29.12.2011 | WO2012JP08457 | 28.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2799401 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2017 | B1 | EP2799401 | 19.08.2015 | A4 | EP2799401 | 05.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011290235 | 29.12.2011 | WO2012JP08457 | 28.12.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013099292 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011290235 | 29.12.2011 |