01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
10.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
19.07.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.07.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.07.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.04.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.12.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.11.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.08.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.08.2018 |
First examination report |
|
28.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.12.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
24.06.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
24.06.2016 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
18.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
19.12.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.10.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
03.10.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
19.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.07.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|