Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9371867 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2016 | B2 | US2014326570 | 06.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP84079 | 28.12.2012 | JP2011287229 | 28.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104011416B | Global Dossier | 17.05.2017 | B | CN104011416 | 27.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP84079 | 28.12.2012 | JP2011287229 | 28.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2799734 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2019 | B1 | EP2799734 | 27.07.2016 | A4 | EP2799734 | 05.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP84079 | 28.12.2012 | JP2011287229 | 28.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014016210 | 03.08.2021 | B1 | BR112014016210 | 04.07.2017 | A8 | BR112014016210 | 13.06.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP84079 | 28.12.2012 | JP2011287229 | 28.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN1278KOLNP2014 | 16.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP84079 | 28.12.2012 | JP2011287229 | 28.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12014501274 | 15.09.2014 | B1 | PH12014501274 | 15.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012JP84079 | 28.12.2012 | JP2011287229 | 28.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013100130 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011287229 | 28.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5995439B | Global Dossier | 21.09.2016 | B2 | JP2013137039 | 11.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011287229 | 28.12.2011 |