EP2799734 - POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. 7000-36 Nakagawa Hosoe-cho Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-1394 / JP | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISOBE, Kenichirou c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo 7000-46 Nakagawa Hosoe-cho, Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | 02 /
KAWASHIMA, Shigeki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo 7000-46 Nakagawa Hosoe-cho, Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | 03 /
FURUHASHI, Shinji c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo 7000-46 Nakagawa Hosoe-cho, Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | 04 /
ANDO, Go c/o Kabushiki Kaisha F.C.C. Gijutsu-Kenkyu-Jo 7000-46 Nakagawa Hosoe-cho, Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-1304 / JP | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2019/34] |
Former [2014/45] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12863436.7 | 28.12.2012 | [2019/34] | WO2012JP84079 | Priority number, date | JP20110287229 | 28.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011287229 | [2014/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013100130 | Date: | 04.07.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2799734 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2799734 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/52, F16D43/21, F16D13/56 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
F16D13/56 (EP,US);
F16D13/54 (US);
F16D2013/565 (EP,US);
F16D2300/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | F16D13/52, F16D43/21 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/45] | English: | POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE | [2014/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE PUISSANCE | [2014/45] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2014 | Translation filed | 18.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 18.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.12.2012 | AL | 21.08.2019 | CY | 21.08.2019 | CZ | 21.08.2019 | DK | 21.08.2019 | EE | 21.08.2019 | ES | 21.08.2019 | FI | 21.08.2019 | HR | 21.08.2019 | LT | 21.08.2019 | LV | 21.08.2019 | MC | 21.08.2019 | MK | 21.08.2019 | MT | 21.08.2019 | NL | 21.08.2019 | PL | 21.08.2019 | RO | 21.08.2019 | RS | 21.08.2019 | SE | 21.08.2019 | SI | 21.08.2019 | SK | 21.08.2019 | SM | 21.08.2019 | TR | 21.08.2019 | BG | 21.11.2019 | NO | 21.11.2019 | GR | 22.11.2019 | IS | 21.12.2019 | PT | 23.12.2019 | IE | 28.12.2019 | LU | 28.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | FR | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 28.12.2012 | |
AL | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
MT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IE | 28.12.2019 | ||
LU | 28.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.12.2012 | |
AL | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IE | 28.12.2019 | ||
LU | 28.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IE | 28.12.2019 | ||
LU | 28.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IE | 28.12.2019 | ||
LU | 28.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IE | 28.12.2019 | ||
LU | 28.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IE | 28.12.2019 | ||
LU | 28.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 21.08.2019 | |
NO | 21.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2037142 (FCC KK [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] - [0021] - [0029]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]JP2010053988 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-5* abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2009068578 (FCC KK); | [Y]JP2010053988 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2010223296 |