EP2826209 - ALLOCATING BANDWIDTH IN A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2015/04] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOURRILHES, Jean 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | 02 /
WEBB, Kevin Christopher 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | 03 /
BANERJEE, Sujata 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | 04 /
MOGUL, Jeffrey Clifford 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | 05 /
SHARMA, Puneet 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | 06 /
YALAGANDULA, Praveen 1501 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | Holt, Daniel Richard Hewlett Packard Enterprise Group c/o Company Secretary, Legal Department Cain Road Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Williams Powell 11 Staple Inn London WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 12870972.2 | 14.03.2012 | WO2012US29109 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013137875 | Date: | 19.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2826209 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.09.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
H04L47/748 (EP,US);
H04L47/783 (US);
H04L47/12 (EP,US);
H04L47/762 (EP,US);
H04L12/462 (EP,US);
H04L47/822 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Title | German: | BANDBREITENZUORDNUNG IN EINEM NETZWERK | [2015/04] | English: | ALLOCATING BANDWIDTH IN A NETWORK | [2015/04] | French: | AFFECTATION DE LARGEUR DE BANDE DANS UN RÉSEAU | [2015/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 24.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1076472 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0022] * * claims 1-3, 24 * * figure 5 *; | [I]US2003123482 (KIM SEUNG HWAN [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038] * * claims 1-5, 13 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2007189298 (WONG WITTY [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0152] * * claims 1, 6, 10, 22-23 ** figures 2-4 * | International search | [A]US6985436 (BHASKAR MARUTHI [US]); | [A]US2007189298 (WONG WITTY [CN], et al); | [A]US7362975 (CHOI SU IL [KR], et al); | [A]US2011161973 (KLOTS BORIS [US], et al) | by applicant | US2003123482 |