Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2757466

EP2757466 - A computer implemented method for generating computer program code [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Generative Software GmbH
15, Cornelia-Schlosser-Allee
79111 Freiburg / DE
[2018/22]
Former [2014/30]For all designated states
Generative Software GmbH
15, Cornelia-Schlosser-Allee
79111 Freiburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Munzert, Marcus
15, Cornelia-Schlosser-Allee
79111 Freiburg / DE
02 / Rohmer, Heinz
5, Kirchbergstrasse
78176 Blumberg / DE
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Linhart, Friedrich Karl Eberhard
La Couronnette
1166 Perroy / CH
[2018/22]
Former [2014/39]Linhart, Friedrich Karl Eberhard
Römerstraße 39
78183 Hüfingen / DE
Former [2014/30]Weiss, Peter
Dres. Weiss & Arat
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Zeppelinstrasse 4
78234 Engen / DE
Application number, filing date13151712.017.01.2013
[2014/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2757466
Date:23.07.2014
Language:DE
[2014/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2757466
Date:30.05.2018
Language:DE
[2018/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44
[2014/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/22]
Former [2014/30]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Computerimplementiertes Verfahren zum Generieren von Computerprogrammcode[2014/30]
English:A computer implemented method for generating computer program code[2014/30]
French:Procédé implémenté par ordinateur destiné à générer du code de programme informatique[2014/30]
Examination procedure09.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
17.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
02.06.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
14.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
11.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2018Observations by third parties
12.03.2018Fee for grant paid
12.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18173712.3  / EP3432139
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.03.2015
Opposition(s)01.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/11]CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/10]CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/09]CY30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/08]CY30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/03]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/52]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/51]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/50]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/49]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
NO30.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2110741  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-3 *
ExaminationEP0463583
    - Aho ET AL, "Compilers. Principles, Techniques, and Tools", COMPILERS : PRINCIPLES, TECHNIQUES, AND TOOLS., US, UPPER SADDLE RIVER, NJ : PRENTICE HALL., (19860101), 031066, ISBN 978-0-201-10194-2, XP055238379