Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8855647 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2014 | B2 | US2014051447 | 20.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201210089864 | 30.03.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102595561B | Global Dossier | 29.04.2015 | B | CN102595561 | 18.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201210089864 | 30.03.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2645805 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2015 | B1 | EP2645805 | 02.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201210089864 | 30.03.2012 |