EP2645805 - Radio resource control connection reestablishment method and terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/21] |
Former [2013/40] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Li, Dui Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/01] |
Former [2013/40] | 01 /
Li, Dui Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [2015/21] |
Former [2013/40] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13154567.5 | 08.02.2013 | [2013/40] | Priority number, date | CN20121089864 | 30.03.2012 Original published format: CN201210089864 | [2013/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2645805 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2645805 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/02 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
H04W36/0079 (EP,US);
H04W36/0064 (EP,US);
H04W36/00835 (EP);
H04W76/18 (EP,US);
H04W84/045 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Terminal zur Wiederherstellung einer Funkressourcensteuerverbindung RRC | [2013/40] | English: | Radio resource control connection reestablishment method and terminal | [2013/40] | French: | Procédé et appareil de rétablissement de connexion de gestion des ressources radio RRC | [2015/01] |
Former [2013/40] | Procédé et appareil de rétablissement de connexion de gestion des ressources radio rrc | Examination procedure | 08.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 17.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2013 | AL | 20.05.2015 | AT | 20.05.2015 | BE | 20.05.2015 | CY | 20.05.2015 | CZ | 20.05.2015 | DK | 20.05.2015 | EE | 20.05.2015 | ES | 20.05.2015 | FI | 20.05.2015 | HR | 20.05.2015 | IT | 20.05.2015 | LT | 20.05.2015 | LV | 20.05.2015 | MC | 20.05.2015 | MK | 20.05.2015 | NL | 20.05.2015 | PL | 20.05.2015 | RO | 20.05.2015 | RS | 20.05.2015 | SE | 20.05.2015 | SI | 20.05.2015 | SK | 20.05.2015 | SM | 20.05.2015 | TR | 20.05.2015 | BG | 20.08.2015 | NO | 20.08.2015 | GR | 21.08.2015 | IS | 20.09.2015 | PT | 21.09.2015 | IE | 08.02.2016 | LU | 08.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 08.02.2013 | |
AT | 20.05.2015 | ||
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CY | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MK | 20.05.2015 | ||
NL | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
SM | 20.05.2015 | ||
TR | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 08.02.2016 | ||
LU | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.02.2013 | |
AT | 20.05.2015 | ||
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CY | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MK | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
NL | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
SM | 20.05.2015 | ||
TR | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 08.02.2016 | ||
LU | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.02.2013 | |
AT | 20.05.2015 | ||
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CY | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MK | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
NL | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
SM | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 08.02.2016 | ||
LU | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
NL | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 08.02.2016 | ||
LU | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 08.02.2016 | ||
LU | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
LU | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
IT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
ES | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
RS | 20.05.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2455610 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [I]US2011105074 (WU CHIH-HSIANG [TW]); | [A]WO2011099745 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) |