Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014230478 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13155414 | 15.02.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103997874B | Global Dossier | 07.12.2016 | B | CN103997874 | 20.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP13155414 | 15.02.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2767783 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2016 | B1 | EP2767783 | 20.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13155414 | 15.02.2013 |