EP2651190 - Lighting system, lighting apparatus, and lighting control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20 Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2019/50] |
Former [2013/49] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20 Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. LG Twin Towers, 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Min, Youjoo LG Electronics Inc., Gasan R&D Campus, 327-23 Gasan-dong, Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kim, Jooyeon LG Electronics Inc., Gasan R&D Campus, 327-23 Gasan-dong, Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | 03 /
Lee, Jinsun LG Electronics Inc., Gasan R&D Campus, 327-23 Gasan-dong, Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | 04 /
Lee, Jisook LG Electronics Inc., Gasan R&D Campus, 327-23 Gasan-dong, Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | 05 /
Ryu, Grami LG Electronics Inc., Gasan R&D Campus, 327-23 Gasan-dong, Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | 06 /
Kim, Moonsung LG Electronics Inc., Gasan R&D Campus, 327-23 Gasan-dong, Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | 07 /
Yang, Jeonghwa LG Electronics Inc., Gasan R&D Campus, 327-23 Gasan-dong, Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | 08 /
Jeon, Jongsun LG Electronics Inc., Gasan R&D Campus, 327-23 Gasan-dong, Geumcheon-gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13160549.5 | 22.03.2013 | [2013/42] | Priority number, date | KR20120038068 | 12.04.2012 Original published format: KR 20120038068 | KR20120038069 | 12.04.2012 Original published format: KR 20120038069 | US201261746573P | 28.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261746573 P | [2013/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2651190 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2651190 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/00, G08C17/02 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
H05B47/115 (EP,US);
G08C17/02 (EP,US);
H05B45/00 (EP,US);
H05B47/19 (EP,US);
H05B47/1965 (EP);
G08C2201/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/42] | H05B37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beleuchtungssystem, Beleuchtungsvorrichtung und Beleuchtungssteuerungsverfahren | [2013/42] | English: | Lighting system, lighting apparatus, and lighting control method | [2013/42] | French: | Système d'éclairage, appareil d'éclairage et procédé de commande d'éclairage | [2013/42] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 08.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/46] | Divisional application(s) | EP14186077.5 / EP2846319 | EP14186088.2 / EP2843638 | EP15152678.7 / EP2892038 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009122086 (DIEDERIKS ELMO M A [NL], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] *; | [I]US2010244708 (CHEUNG CHI HANG [HK], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0041] * |