Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
04.06.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.05.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.10.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |
12.09.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |